Bay Area Surgical Group, Inc. v. Blue Cross of California
Plaintiff: Bay Area Surgical Group, Inc.
Defendant: Blue Cross of California
Case Number: 5:2011cv00280
Filed: January 19, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 5/13/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2011)
April 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE AND RELATED DEADLINES re 14 . Case Management Conference set for 5/20/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/13/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2011)
April 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING MOTION 9 TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on April 12, 2011. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bay Area Surgical Group, Inc. v. Blue Cross of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross of California
Represented By: Karen A. Braje
Represented By: Kurt Charles Peterson
Represented By: Kenneth Neil Smersfelt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bay Area Surgical Group, Inc.
Represented By: Nicolas Matthew Lezotte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?