Guenther v. Lockheed Martin Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Charles Guenther
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Corporation and Lockheed Martin Corporation Retirement Plan for Certain Salaried Employees
Case Number: 5:2011cv00380
Filed: January 26, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER granting 182 Motion for Extension of Time to File Appeal. Plaintiff shall file the notice of appeal forthwith. The hearing scheduled for 5/10/2018 is therefore VACATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/7/2018. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2018)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER granting 133 Motion for Summary Judgment. All other matters are TERMINATED and VACATED. Judgment will be entered in favor of Lockheed and the Clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/1/2017. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2017)
January 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting 64 Motion for Summary Judgment. Judgment will be entered in favor of Defendants and the Clerk of Court shall close the file. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/3/2014. (ejdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2014)
November 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 88 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 87 Stipulation to Continue Pretrial Deadlines; [Proposed] Order filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation Retirement Plan for Certain Salaried Employees, Lockheed Martin Corporation. All pretrial dates and deadlines in this action, including but not limited to the followingdeadlines, shall be continued until after the Court has ruled upon Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/5/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2013)
October 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting 50 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/1/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2013)
July 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER CLARIFYING DEADLINE TO FILE DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS. The court clarifies that the deadline for filing dispositive motions for hearing on 9/27/2013 is 8/23/2013. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/17/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2013)
July 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 60 Discovery Dispute Joint Report #1. Plaintiff's request to compel discovery denied without prejudice. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2013)
May 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 PRETRIAL ORDER. Based on the parties' Joint Preliminary Pretrial Conference Statement and the discussions held at the 5/17/2013 conference, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following schedule shall apply to this case: Motion Hearing set for 7/5/ 2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila re 50 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Lockheed Martin Corporation, and Lockheed Martin Corporation Salaried Employee Retirement Programs Notice of Motion and M otion for Summary Adjudication re Applicable Standard of Review. Anticipated Cross-Motions for SummaryJudgment Hearing set for 9/27/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Joint Final Pretrial Conference Statement and Motions in Limine due by 11/1/2013. Bench Trial set for 11/26/2013 09:00 AM before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/20/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2013)
November 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Order Granting 42 Motion to Extinguish Stay and Set Case Management Conference. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 11/30/2012.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2012)
September 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER MAINTAINING STAY; VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 09/10/2012. (ejdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2012)
December 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Request for Extension of Deadline to Complete ADR Session re 35 Stipulation. The deadline to complete the ADR session shall be continued until sixty (60) days after the Court issues a decision on Defendants'Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/8/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2011)
August 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Motion to Dismiss and Case Management Conference from 8/26/2011 to 9/16/2011 re 23 Stipulation. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 14 MOTION to Dismiss The First Amended Complaint: Opposition due by 8/19/2011. Reply due by 8/26/2011. Motion Hearing set for 9/16/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/9/2011. Case Management Conference set for 9/16/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose. ***8/26/2011 Deadlines/Hearings terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/18/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guenther v. Lockheed Martin Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Guenther
Represented By: Andrew Field Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Corporation
Represented By: R. Bradford Huss
Represented By: Clarissa A. Kang
Represented By: Benjamin P Quest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Corporation Retirement Plan for Certain Salaried Employees
Represented By: R. Bradford Huss
Represented By: Clarissa A. Kang
Represented By: Benjamin P Quest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?