Stanford Hospitals and Clinics , v. Archstone Communities, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Stanford Hospitals and Clinics ,
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group Incorporated and Archstone Communities, LLC
Case Number: 5:2011cv00620
Filed: February 10, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 11/9/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2011)
July 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING ADR DEADLINE re 42 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 7/19/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2011)
June 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION AND ORDER ON BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT re 38 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/8/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2011)
May 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING 17 MOTION TO DISMISS, WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 5/6/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2011)
May 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS re 27 , Case referred to Private ADR. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/29/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stanford Hospitals and Clinics , v. Archstone Communities, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group Incorporated
Represented By: David Michael Humiston
Represented By: Dina Rebecca Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Archstone Communities, LLC
Represented By: Rena Chng
Represented By: Christopher Comstock
Represented By: Marcia E. Goodman
Represented By: Edward Albert Stumpp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanford Hospitals and Clinics ,
Represented By: Barry Sullivan
Represented By: Richard Alan Lovich
Represented By: Sara Hilary Frisch
Represented By: Oliver De Castro Tomas
Represented By: Melanie Joy Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?