Krieger v. Atheros Communications, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Joel Krieger
Defendant: Teresa H. Meng, Craig H. Barratt, Andrew S. Rappaport, Dan a. Artusi, Charles E. Harris, Marshall L. Mohr, Christine King, Atheros Communications, Inc., Willy C. Shih, Qualcomm Incorporated and T Merger Sub, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2011cv00640
Filed: February 10, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 73 Stipulation.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2012)
May 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 59 and 64 Motions to Dismiss.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2012) Modified on 5/29/2012 (lhklc1, COURT STAFF).
March 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 63 Stipulation.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2012)
December 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 52 Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2011)
June 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER by Hon. Lucy H. Koh Permitting Filing of Amended Complaint; Denying 36 Motion to Dismiss as Moot; Granting in Part and Denying in Part 44 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2011)
June 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 43 (MODIFIED BY THE COURT). Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 6/15/2011. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2011)
June 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER REQUESTING CLARIFICATION REGARDING PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Koh on 6/10/2011. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2011)
May 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE for 36 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Koh on 5/5/2011. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2011)
April 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 40 Regarding Stay of Discovery and Case Management Deadlines. Signed by Judge Koh on 4/22/2011. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2011)
March 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 34 EXTENDING DEFENDANT'S TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Koh on 3/11/2011. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2011)
March 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by Judge Koh STAYING STATE LAW CLAIMS; DENYING 6 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2011)
March 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER APPROVING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE re 29 Notice (Other) filed by Joel Krieger. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/2/11. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2011)
February 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge Koh granting 24 APPLICATION of Robert H. Baron for Admission Pro Hac Vice. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2011)
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER RESCHEDULING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 3/3/2011 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Koh on 2/18/2011. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2011)
February 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 3/1/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Koh on 2/16/2011. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krieger v. Atheros Communications, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa H. Meng
Represented By: Amy L Pierce
Represented By: David Malcolm Furbush
Represented By: Ranah Leila Esmaili
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig H. Barratt
Represented By: Ranah Leila Esmaili
Represented By: David Malcolm Furbush
Represented By: Amy L Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew S. Rappaport
Represented By: Ranah Leila Esmaili
Represented By: David Malcolm Furbush
Represented By: Amy L Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan a. Artusi
Represented By: Ranah Leila Esmaili
Represented By: David Malcolm Furbush
Represented By: Amy L Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles E. Harris
Represented By: Ranah Leila Esmaili
Represented By: David Malcolm Furbush
Represented By: Amy L Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshall L. Mohr
Represented By: Ranah Leila Esmaili
Represented By: David Malcolm Furbush
Represented By: Amy L Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine King
Represented By: Ranah Leila Esmaili
Represented By: David Malcolm Furbush
Represented By: Amy L Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atheros Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Amy L Pierce
Represented By: David Malcolm Furbush
Represented By: Ranah Leila Esmaili
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willy C. Shih
Represented By: Amy L Pierce
Represented By: David Malcolm Furbush
Represented By: Ranah Leila Esmaili
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qualcomm Incorporated
Represented By: Robert H. Baron
Represented By: David Allen Priebe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Merger Sub, Inc.
Represented By: David Allen Priebe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Krieger
Represented By: Vahn Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?