GlobalMedia Group LLC v. Logitech Inc
Plaintiff: GlobalMedia Group LLC
Defendant: Logitech Inc
Case Number: 5:2011cv00778
Filed: February 22, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER DENYING 62 Motion to Stay. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 7/13/12. (ejdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2012)
June 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER GRANTING 50 SECOND AMENDED APPLICATION/PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 6/7/12. See order for specifics about choosing the arbitrator. (ejdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2012)
May 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Accordingly, the conference currently scheduled for 6/1/2012, is VACATED and will be reset in the order addressing the Petition/Application to Compel Arbitration, if necessary. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/30/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2012)
May 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO STRIKE. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 5/15/2012.(ejdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2012)
August 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Request for Extension of Time to File Sur-reply re 35 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/16/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2011)
May 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation re 24 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/12/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GlobalMedia Group LLC v. Logitech Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GlobalMedia Group LLC
Represented By: John J Edmonds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Logitech Inc
Represented By: Indra Neel Chatterjee
Represented By: Christina Marie Von Der Ahe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?