Copeland v. Lane et al
Plaintiff: A. J. Copeland
Defendant: Raymond J. Lane, Gary Reiner, Leo Apotheker, Meg Whitman, Shumeet Banerji, Patricia Russo, Dominique Senequier, G. Kennedy Thompson, Mark V. Hurd, Marc L. Andreessen, Sari M. Baldauf, Rajiv L Gupta, Lawrence T. Babbio, Jr., John H. Hammergren, Joel Z. Hyatt, John Joyce, Lucille Salhany, Robert Ryan and Hewlett-Packard Company
Case Number: 5:2011cv01058
Filed: March 7, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER Granting 152 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Joel Z. Hyatt, John Joyce, G. Kennedy Thompson, Sari M. Baldauf, Rajiv L Gupta, Lucille Salhany, Robert Ryan, Lawrence T. Babbio, Jr., John H. Hammergren. Attorney Garrett J. Waltzer terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/5/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2013)
November 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/19/2013. Case Management Conference set for 4/26/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davil a on 11/28/2012. The statement shall not exceed ten pages in length as required by the Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District of California. Any disputes with respect to discovery or disclosure, including any motions to compel, are r eferred to the assigned Magistrate Judge. Any request to stay disclosures or to stay discovery my be presented to this court through a motion for administrative relief. ***11/30/2012 CMC deadlines terminated. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on November 28, 2012.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2012)
October 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER granting 68 ; 71 ; 72 ; 74 Motions to Dismiss; finding as moot 89 Motion to Strike. Any amended complaint shall be filed no later than 11/1/2012. The court schedules this case for a Case Management Conference on 11/30/2012 at 10:00 a.m. The parties shall file a Joint Case Management Conference Statement on or before 11/21/2012. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/10/2012. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2012)
February 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER GRANTING 66 Notice of Change In Counsel filed by Gary Reiner, Meg Whitman, Raymond J. Lane, Dominique Senequier, Patricia Russo, Shumeet Banerji, Leo Apotheker, Attorney Rebecca Justice Lazarus terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/13/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2012)
November 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER denying 39 Motion to Consolidate Cases. The motion hearing scheduled for December 2, 2011, is VACATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/28/2011. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2011)
November 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 60 STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT AS TO 53 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order re: Case Schedule. The Clerk shall terminate Docket Item No. 10. The Motion to Consolidate and Case Management Conference remain on calendar for December 2, 2011.. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/15/2011. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2011)
October 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER GRANTING 49 Notice of Substitution of Counsel. Allen Ruby for Lawrence T. Babbio, Jr,Allen Ruby for Sari M. Baldauf,Allen Ruby for Rajiv L Gupta,Allen Ruby for John H. Hammergren,Allen Ruby for Joel Z. Hyatt,Allen Ruby for John Joyce,Allen Ruby for Robert Ryan,Allen Ruby for Lucille Salhany,Allen Ruby for G. Kennedy Thompson added. Attorney James Elliot Lyons terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/6/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2011)
August 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER GRANTING 46 STIPULATION AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. All matters currently scheduled for hearing on 12/2/2011 shall remain as set unless otherwise ordered. The parties shall clarify for the court whether the Motion to Dismiss will proceed on 12/2/2011 in a brief joint statement filed on or before 11/10/2011. A complete CMC statement is due on or before 11/25/2011. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/17/2011. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2011)
June 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT GRANTING REQUEST TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND ANTICIPATED HEARING re 41 Stipulation. Anticipated Motion Hearing set for 12/2/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/22/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Copeland v. Lane et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. J. Copeland
Represented By: Lesley Elizabeth Weaver
Represented By: Scott R. Shepard
Represented By: Rosemary Farrales Luzon
Represented By: Patrick A. Klingman
Represented By: Richard D. Greenfield
Represented By: Marguerite R. Goodman
Represented By: Ilene Freier Brookler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond J. Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Reiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leo Apotheker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meg Whitman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shumeet Banerji
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Russo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominique Senequier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Kennedy Thompson
Represented By: James Elliot Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark V. Hurd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc L. Andreessen
Represented By: James Elliot Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sari M. Baldauf
Represented By: James Elliot Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rajiv L Gupta
Represented By: James Elliot Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence T. Babbio, Jr.
Represented By: James Elliot Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John H. Hammergren
Represented By: James Elliot Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Z. Hyatt
Represented By: James Elliot Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Joyce
Represented By: James Elliot Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucille Salhany
Represented By: James Elliot Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Ryan
Represented By: James Elliot Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hewlett-Packard Company
Represented By: Jill Marie Baisinger
Represented By: Jonathan C. Dickey
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Franklin Brockway Gowdy
Represented By: Katherine Leigh Henderson
Represented By: Kimberly Alexander Kane
Represented By: Rebecca Justice Lazarus
Represented By: Karen A. Pieslak Pohlmann
Represented By: Steven Mark Schatz
Represented By: Marc J. Sonnenfeld
Represented By: Diane Leslie Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?