Tetsuya v. You Tube, LLC
Plaintiff: Joe Nomura Tetsuya
Defendant: You Tube, LLC
Case Number: 5:2011cv01208
Filed: March 11, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER by Judge Lloyd denying 125 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution; granting 134 Motion for Summary Judgment (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2013)
August 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER by Judge Lloyd granting in part and denying in part 121 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 124 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2013)
July 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 119 Order by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 114 Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Expert Reports and Complete Expert Discovery(rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2013)
April 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 111 Order by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 110 Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2013)
April 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 109 Certificate/Proof of Service of 108 (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2013)
April 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 107 Order by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 101 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Daniel Stephen Mount and Kevin Martin Pasquinelli terminated (rmwlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2013)
April 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 105 Order by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 102 Motion to Expedite (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2013)
March 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 95 Order by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 94 Motion to Appear by Telephone (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2013)
February 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER construing claims of U.S. Patent No. 7,254,622 (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2013)
December 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 88 Order by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 87 Motion to allow equipment into the courtroom (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2012)
December 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER denying 80 Motion to Strike (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2012)
November 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Order by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 77 Stipulation.(rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2012)
March 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER re Joint Stipulation re Scheduling. Parties to file Joint Case Management Statement by 4/17/2012. Case management conference set for 4/24/2012, 1:30 PM, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 3/19/2012. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tetsuya v. You Tube, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Nomura Tetsuya
Represented By: Kevin Martin Pasquinelli
Represented By: Daniel Stephen Mount
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: You Tube, LLC
Represented By: Victor Yee Kay Hsue
Represented By: Bryan J. Sinclair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?