Tetsuya et al-v- Amazon.Com,Inc
Plaintiff: Nomura Joe Tetsuya
Defendant: Amazon.Com, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2011cv01210
Filed: March 11, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER by Judge Lloyd denying 124 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution; granting 131 Motion for Summary Judgment (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2013)
August 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER by Judge Lloyd denying 123 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 125 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2013)
July 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 121 Order by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 118 Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Expert Reports and Complete Expert Discovery(rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2013)
April 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 116 Order by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 115 Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2013)
April 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 114 Certificate/Proof of Service of 113 (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2013)
April 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 112 Order by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 106 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Daniel Stephen Mount and Kevin Martin Pasquinelli terminated(rmwlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2013)
April 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 110 Order by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 107 Motion to Expedite (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2013)
March 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 100 Order by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 99 Motion to Appear by Telephone (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2013)
February 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER construing claims of U.S. Patent No. 7,254,622 (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2013)
December 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 93 Order by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 92 Motion to allow equipment into the courtroom (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2012)
December 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Order by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd denying 85 Motion to Strike (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2012)
November 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 83 Order by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 82 Stipulation.(rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2012)
February 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 60 Discovery Dispute Joint Report #1. Plaintiff to serve amended infringement contentions within 14 days from the date of this order. Parties to meet-and-confer re any necessary modifications to other court-ordered deadlines.(hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2012)
January 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 59 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 58 Modifying Case Management Order as follows: Defendant's Invalidity Contentions due by 3/2/2012. Exchange of Proposed Terms for Construction: 3/16/2012. Exchange of Preliminary Claim Constructions and Extrinsic Evidence: 3/23/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 1/18/2012. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2012)
January 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 57 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 56 to Extend Mediation Deadline. Deadline for mediation: 3/9/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 1/5/2012. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2012)
November 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd denying 41 plaintiff's (1) motion to strike affirmative defenses, (2) motion to dismiss counterclaims, and (3) motion for summary judgment. 11/15/2011 hearing is vacated. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2011)
June 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Order by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 10 defendant's Motion to Dismiss with leave to amend. 6/28/2011 motion hearing vacated. Plaintiff's amended complaint due within 30 days from the date of this order.(hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2011)
May 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Setting Deadline for Plaintiff to Either Consent or Decline to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. Plaintiff's consent or declination due by 5/31/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 5/18/2011. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tetsuya et al-v- Amazon.Com,Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nomura Joe Tetsuya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.Com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?