Wilson v. Finisar Corporation et al
Plaintiff: |
Chris L. Wilson |
Defendant: |
Jerry S. Rawls, Eitan Gertel, Kurt Adzema and Finisar Corporation |
Case Number: |
5:2011cv01278 |
Filed: |
March 16, 2011 |
Court: |
U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California |
Office: |
San Jose Office |
County: |
Santa Clara |
Presiding Judge: |
Edward J. Davila |
Presiding Judge: |
Howard R. Lloyd |
Nature of Suit: |
Securities/Commodities/Exchanges |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. § 78 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 5, 2011 |
Filing
15
ORDER Granting [12 in 5:11-cv-01252-EJD] Motion to Relate Case with C-11-1278 CW, C-11-1635 PJH. Accordingly, the Clerk of Court shall immediately relate Derchi-Russo v. Finisar Corporation, et al., Case No. CV 11-1252 EJD to Wilson v. Finisar Corpor ation, et al., Case N o. CV 11-1278 CW and Wade v. Finisar Corporation, et al., Case No. CV 11-1635 PJH. The parties in all three cases shall appear for a Case Management Conference on June 15, 2011 at 9 a.m. On or before June 6, 2011, the parties sh all file a Joint Case Management Statement. The Statement shall address whether the cases should be consolidated and if so, a schedule for nomination of Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/4/2011. (Order posted corrects typographical error case number re Order Relating Case in 16 in 5:11-cv-01252-EJD, 14 in 5:11-cv-01278-EJD and 12 in 4:11-cv-01635-PJH). (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2011)
|
May 4, 2011 |
Filing
14
ORDER RELATING CASE; SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Accordingly, the Clerk of Court shall immediately relate Derchi-Russo v. Finisar Corporation, et al., Case No. CV 11-1252 EJD to Wilson v. Finisar Corporation, et al., Case No. CV 11-1278 CW an d Wade v. Finisar Corporation, et al., Case No. CV 11-1635 PJH. The parties in all three cases shall appear for a Case Management Conference on June 15, 2011 at 9 a.m. On or before June 6, 2011, the parties shall file a Joint Case Management Statement. The Statement shall address whether the cases should be consolidated and if so, a schedule for nomination of Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/4/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2011)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?