Scocca et al v. Smith et al

Plaintiff: Tom Scocca, Madison Society, Inc and The Calguns Foundations, Inc
Defendant: Laurie Smith and County of Santa Clara
Case Number: 5:2011cv01318
Filed: March 18, 2011
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 5, 2016 105 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 104 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal and Vacate CMC filed by Madison Society, Inc, The Calguns Foundations, Inc, Tom Scocca. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/5/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2016)
August 4, 2016 102 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 101 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue CMC filed by Madison Society, Inc, The Calguns Foundations, Inc, Tom Scocca. Case Management Statement due by 11/3/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/10/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/4/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2016)
April 11, 2016 99 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 98 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING APRIL 21, 2016 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Laurie Smith, County of Santa Clara. Case Management Statement due by 8/18/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/25/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/11/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2016)
February 22, 2016 97 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING MARCH 3, 2016 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re: 96 : Case Management Statement due by 4/14/2016. Further Case Management Conference reset for 4/21/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/22/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2016)
January 22, 2016 95 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 94 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING JANUARY 28, 2016 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Laurie Smith, County of Santa Clara. CMC reset for 3/3/16 at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/22/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2016)
December 2, 2015 93 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 92 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING DECEMBER 10, 2015 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Laurie Smith, County of Santa Clara Case Management Statement due by 1/21/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/28/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/2/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2015)
August 3, 2015 91 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 90 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING AUGUST 6, 2015 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Laurie Smith, County of Santa Clara Case Management Statement due by 12/3/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/10/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/3/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2015)
June 3, 2015 87 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER resetting cmc. Case Management Statement due by 7/30/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/6/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/3/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2015)
March 17, 2015 85 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 84 Stipulation filed by Laurie Smith, County of Santa Clara Case Management Statement due by 6/11/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/18/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/17/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2015)
November 5, 2014 83 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 82 Stipulation filed by Laurie Smith, County of Santa Clara Case Management Statement due by 3/19/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/26/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/5/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2014)
August 18, 2014 81 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 80 STIPULATION CONTINUING SEPTEMBER 4, 2014 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Laurie Smith, County of Santa Clara. Case Management Statement due by 11/6/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/13/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward Chen on 8/15/2014. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2014)
May 6, 2014 79 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 78 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING MAY 15, 2014 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Laurie Smith, County of Santa Clara Case Management Statement due by 8/28/2014. Case Management Conference reset for 9/4/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/6/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2014)
March 21, 2014 77 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 76 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING APRIL 15, 2014 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Laurie Smith, County of Santa Clara Case Management Statement due by 5/8/2014. Case Management Conference set for 5/15/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/21/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2014)
January 30, 2014 72 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 71 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING FEBRUARY 4, 2014 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Laurie Smith, County of Santa Clara Case Management Statement due by 6/5/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/12/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/30/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2014)
November 22, 2013 69 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 68 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING THE DECEMBER 5, 2013 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Laurie Smith, County of Santa Clara Case Management Statement due by 1/30/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/6/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/22/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2013)
August 27, 2013 67 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 66 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and Order Continuing Case Management Conference filed by Laurie Smith, County of Santa Clara Case Management Statement due by 11/27/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/5/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/27/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2013)
April 22, 2013 65 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING CMC. Case Management Statement due by 8/22/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/29/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/22/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2013)
January 14, 2013 63 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 62 for Stay filed by Madison Society, Inc, The Calguns Foundations, Inc, Tom Scocca. CMC reset for 4/25/13 at 10:30 a.m. Case Management Statement due by 4/18/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/25/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/14/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2013)
December 17, 2012 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Deferring in Part 47 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2012)
November 13, 2012 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Sur-Reply. The sur-reply brief shall be filed no later than 2:00 p.m. on November 14, 2012. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/13/2012. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2012)
November 1, 2012 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RESETTING CMC FROM 11/15/12 TO 1/31/13 AT 10:30 AM. Case Management Statement due by 1/24/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/31/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/1/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2012)
September 26, 2012 49 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 48 Adjust Law/Motion Responses, 47 MOTION to Dismiss FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES. Responses due by 10/15/2012. Replies due by 10/22/2012.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/26/12. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2012)
August 16, 2012 45 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 44 EXTENDING DEFENDANTS' DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Laurie Smith, County of Santa Clara. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/16/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2012)
July 9, 2012 42 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING CMC FROM 7/13/12 TO 11/15/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Re 41 Joint Case Management Statement filed by Laurie Smith, County of Santa Clara Case Management Statement due by 11/6/2012. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2012)
June 22, 2012 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 9 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2012)
June 12, 2012 39 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING CMC FROM 8/24/12 TO 7/13/12. Case Management Statement due by 7/6/2012. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/13/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/12/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2012)
February 14, 2012 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STAYING CASE. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/14/2012. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2012)
January 26, 2012 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RESETTING CMC Case Management Statement due by 2/17/2012. Case Management Conference set for 2/24/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/26/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2012)
January 23, 2012 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiffs' Show Cause Response due by 1/30/2012. Defendants' Response due by 2/6/2012. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/23/2012. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2012)
December 1, 2011 27 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Motion Hearing reset for 1/6/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/1/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2011)
October 5, 2011 22 Opinion or Order of the Court STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/5/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2011)
August 5, 2011 17 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RESCHEDULING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on August 5, 2011. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2011)
July 6, 2011 12 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: SCHEDULING ORDERS AND VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 11 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/21/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scocca et al v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Scocca
Represented By: Jason A. Davis
Represented By: Donald E.J. Kilmer, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madison Society, Inc
Represented By: Jason A. Davis
Represented By: Donald E.J. Kilmer, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Calguns Foundations, Inc
Represented By: Jason A. Davis
Represented By: Donald E.J. Kilmer, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurie Smith
Represented By: Melissa R. Kiniyalocts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Santa Clara
Represented By: Melissa R. Kiniyalocts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?