Shia Association of Bay Area, Inc., et al v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Plaintiff: Shia Association of Bay Area, Inc.,, Nabi Raza Mir, Syeda Gulshan Zahera, A.R.M1, A.R.M2, A.R.M3, A.R.M4 and A.R.M5
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, Janet Napolitano, Alejandro Mayorkas, Rosemary L. Melville, Eric Holder, Hilary Clinton, Perry Rhew and David Aguilar
Case Number: 5:2011cv01369
Filed: March 22, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting 40 Stipulation.(sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2013)
December 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti denying 35 Motion for Attorney Fees and 37 Stipulation to Extend Defendants' Time to Respond. (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2012)
February 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 2/3/2012. (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2012)
February 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting 24 Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2012)
August 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR FILING, BRIEFING AND ARGUMENT ON PLAINTIFFS' ANTICIPATED SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION re 22 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 7/28/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2011)
May 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER APPROVING 19 STIPULATION. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 5/13/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2011)
May 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER APPROVING 16 STIPULATION FOR ORDER TO REMOVE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION FROM HEARING CALENDAR. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 5/3/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2011)
April 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION re 14 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/15/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2011)
April 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND SETTING MOTION HEARING ON 5/6/2011 AT 09:00 AM re 8 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/11/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shia Association of Bay Area, Inc., et al v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shia Association of Bay Area, Inc.,
Represented By: Stacey L. Gartland
Represented By: Marc Van Der Hout
Represented By: Marc VanDerHout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nabi Raza Mir
Represented By: Stacey L. Gartland
Represented By: Marc Van Der Hout
Represented By: Marc VanDerHout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Syeda Gulshan Zahera
Represented By: Stacey L. Gartland
Represented By: Marc Van Der Hout
Represented By: Marc VanDerHout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.R.M1
Represented By: Stacey L. Gartland
Represented By: Marc Van Der Hout
Represented By: Marc VanDerHout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.R.M2
Represented By: Stacey L. Gartland
Represented By: Marc Van Der Hout
Represented By: Marc VanDerHout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.R.M3
Represented By: Stacey L. Gartland
Represented By: Marc Van Der Hout
Represented By: Marc VanDerHout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.R.M4
Represented By: Stacey L. Gartland
Represented By: Marc Van Der Hout
Represented By: Marc VanDerHout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.R.M5
Represented By: Stacey L. Gartland
Represented By: Marc Van Der Hout
Represented By: Marc VanDerHout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Melissa Leibman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Napolitano
Represented By: Melissa Leibman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By: Melissa Leibman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosemary L. Melville
Represented By: Melissa Leibman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Holder
Represented By: Melissa Leibman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilary Clinton
Represented By: Melissa Leibman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Rhew
Represented By: Melissa Leibman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Aguilar
Represented By: Melissa Leibman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?