April 10, 2014 |
Filing
135
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SETTLEMENT. Stipulated Dismissal or Joint Statement due by 6/20/2014. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 6/27/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. All other pretrial deadlines an d hearing dates are VACATED and any pending motions are TERMINATED. Failure to comply with any part of this Order will be deemed sufficient grounds to dismissthe action. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/10/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
|
December 23, 2013 |
Filing
132
ORDER granting 128 STIPULATION TO EXTEND FACT DISCOVERY CUTOFF AND RELATED CASE DEADLINES AND AMEND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER as modified by the court. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/23/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2013)
|
December 19, 2013 |
Filing
127
ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. This action shall proceed according to the Case Management Order 112 filed 5/7/2013. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/19/2013. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2013)
|
May 14, 2013 |
Filing
116
ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference scheduled for 5/17/2013 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/14/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2013)
|
May 7, 2013 |
Filing
112
STIPULATION AND Order on Joint Stipulation to Continue Deadlines and Amend Scheduling Order re 110 Amended Document filed by Heide Kurtz. Fact Discovery Cutoff 1/13/2014. Last Date for Filing Dispositive Motions due by 4/14/2014. Expert Dis covery cutoff 3/14/2014. Joint Pretrial Conference Statement due by 4/25/2014. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 5/5/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/7/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2013)
|
March 19, 2013 |
Filing
106
ORDER CONTINUING 3/22/2013 MOTION HEARING AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The court finds that a Case Management Conference is premature at this time. Plaintiff's request to continue the hearing on its anticipated motion to amend the schedulin g order is GRANTED. The motion shall be filed and noticed consistent with the provisions of Civil Local Rule 7. Motion Hearing set for 5/17/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Updated Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/10/2013. Case Management Conference set for 5/17/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. Motions terminated: 105 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Heide Kurtz., ***3/22/2013 Deadlines terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/19/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2013)
|
January 29, 2013 |
Filing
101
ORDER VACATING PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. In light of the recent withdrawal of Defendant's attorney and the corresponding stay of all deadlines in this action, the Preliminary Pretrial Conference scheduled for February 1, 2013, is VACATED. The court will address further scheduling issues as necessary at the Case Management Conference currently scheduled for March 22, 2013. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/29/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2013)
|
January 9, 2013 |
Filing
98
ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 3/15/2013. Case Management Conference set for 3/22/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. In addition, Plaintiff should file a Motion to Amend the Schedulin g Order to demonstrate the necessary good cause for its requested extension of deadlines. The court therefore schedules a hearing on the anticipated motion for March 22, 2013, at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Dav ila.The motion shall be filed and noticed consistent with the provisions of Civil Local Rule 7. ***1/14/2013 CMC Deadlines terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/9/2013. (Staff Notes: Plaintiff Mintel Learning Technology, Inc. is listed a pro se but there is no mailing address on the Court's docket to be able to complete service. No copy of order served on pro se). (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2013)
|
November 26, 2012 |
Filing
95
ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO DISMISS; SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Good cause appearing therefor, Defendant's request to withdraw its Motion to Dismiss (Docket Item No. 91) is GRANTED. The hearing scheduled for November 30, 2012, is VACATED. Plaintiff's Motion to Appear Telephonically (Docket Item No. 93) is TERMINATED AS MOOT. Motions terminated: 91 MOTION to Appear by Telephone and Certificate of Service filed by Heide Kurtz. Joint Case Management Conference statement due 1/4/2013. Case Management Conference set for 1/11/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/26/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2012)
|
September 26, 2012 |
Filing
78
ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE. All parties, including J. James Li, shall appear at the Status Conference. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/26/2012. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2012)
|
April 9, 2012 |
Filing
65
ORDER Granting 64 Notice (Other) of Withdrawal of Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati as to Ambow Education Holding, Ltd. Attorney Randal Craig Miller and Matthew Robert Reed terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/9/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2012)
|
March 8, 2012 |
Filing
60
ORDER by Hon. Edward J. Davila DENYING 53 Motion to Dismiss. Signed on 3/8/2012.(ejdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2012)
|
January 6, 2012 |
Filing
51
AMENDED ORDER re 50 ORDER GRANTING 43 Motion to Dismiss WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Amended Pleadings due by 1/13/2012. Motion due by 2/3/2012. Opposition due due by 2/17/2012. Reply due by 2/24/2012. Motion Hearing set for 3/2/2012 09:00 AM in C ourtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/2/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this order which is amended solely to correct the date of the motion hearing and case management conference supersedes yesterday's earlier order in this case. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/6/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2012) Modified text on 1/6/2012 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
|
November 2, 2011 |
Filing
42
ORDER RE SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION AND SERVICE; denying as moot 7 Motion to Authorize Service; denying as moot 15 Motion to Dismiss. Defendant Ambow shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before November 28, 2011. Case Management Conference to be held January 6, 2012 at 10:00 am. Signed by Edward J. Davila on 11/2/2011 (ejdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2011) Modified text on 11/2/2011 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
|
October 6, 2011 |
Filing
40
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION. Plaintiff IS HEREBY ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE why the case should not be dismissed for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. Alternatively, the Plaintiff may amend the complaint to perfect its jurisdictional allegations. Either filing must be made within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order. No hearing will be held on this Order to Show Cause unless otherwise ordered by the court. Signed Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on October 6, 2011(ejdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2011) Modified text on 10/6/2011 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
|
August 18, 2011 |
Filing
31
STIPULATION AND ORDER Resetting Hearing on Motion to Dismiss re 30 Stipulation/ Set/Reset Deadlines as 15 First MOTION to Dismiss: Opposition due by 8/19/2011. Reply due by 8/26/2011. Motion Hearing set for 10/7/2011 09:00 AM before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/18/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2011)
|