Life Technologies Corporation v. Pacific Biosciences of California, Inc
Plaintiff: Life Technologies Corporation
Defendant: Pacific Biosciences of California, Inc
Case Number: 5:2011cv01582
Filed: March 31, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 145
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 92 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting #91 Stipulation (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2012)
April 25, 2012 Filing 91 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice; (Proposed) Order filed by Life Technologies Corporation. (Veravanich, Polaphat) (Filed on 4/25/2012) Modified on 4/26/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER GRANTING (AS MODIFIED) JOINT MOTION TO AMEND PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULE by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting #89 Motion to Amend/Correct ; (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2012)
April 13, 2012 Filing 89 Joint Motion to Amend Pretrial Conference Schedule filed by Pacific Biosciences of California, Inc. Responses due by 4/27/2012. Replies due by 5/4/2012. (Pickard, Byron) (Filed on 4/13/2012) Modified on 4/16/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
February 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO MODIFY THE SCHEDULE by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting #87 Motion to Expedite (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2012)
February 24, 2012 Filing 87 Joint MOTION to Modify the Schedule filed by Life Technologies Corporation. (Ladow, Daniel) (Filed on 2/24/2012) Modified on 2/28/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
January 31, 2012 Filing 86 Transcript of Proceedings held on 1-3-12, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/30/2012. (las, ) (Filed on 1/31/2012)
January 20, 2012 Filing 85 Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing held on 1/20/2012 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court to issue order after hearing. (Date Filed: 1/20/2012). (Court Reporter FTR: (1:32 to 1:51.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/20/2012)
January 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER RE EXCHANGE OF OPENING EXPERT WITNESS REPORTS ON WRITTEN DESCRIPTION. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on January 20, 2012. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2012)
January 19, 2012 Filing 83 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY HEARING: Discovery Hearing set for 1/20/2012 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for a telephonic appearance. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2012)
January 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 82 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting #80 Motion for Protective Order (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2012)
January 17, 2012 Filing 81 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING TELEPHONIC HEARING FOR CLARIFICATION OF 12/7/2011 SCHEDULING ORDER: Hearing set for 1/17/2012 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Parties are instructed to Contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for a telephonic appearance. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2012)
January 13, 2012 Filing 80 Joint MOTION for Entry of Stipulated Protective Order filed by Pacific Biosciences of California, Inc. Responses due by 1/27/2012. Replies due by 2/3/2012. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ellison, Eldora) (Filed on 1/13/2012) Modified on 1/13/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
January 12, 2012 Filing 79 ANSWER to First Amended Crossclaim re #75 by Life Technologies Corporation. (Ladow, Daniel) (Filed on 1/12/2012) Linkage added on 1/12/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
January 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF LIFE TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION'S MOTION TO COMPEL by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting #66 Motion to Compel (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2012)
January 3, 2012 Filing 77 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 1/3/2012 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal (Date Filed: 1/3/2012) re #66 MOTION to Compel ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof filed by Life Technologies Corporation. The Court takes matter under submission; written order after hearing to be issued. (Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/3/2012)
December 30, 2011 Filing 76 Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof re #66 filed by Life Technologies Corporation. (Ladow, Daniel) (Filed on 12/30/2011) Modified on 1/3/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
December 30, 2011 Filing 75 First Amended CROSSCLAIM of Pacific Biosciences of California Inc against Life Technologies Corporation. Filed byPacific Biosciences of California, Inc. (Ellison, Eldora) (Filed on 12/30/2011) Modified on 1/3/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
December 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND CROSS-ACTION COMPLAINT by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting #72 Motion to Amend/Correct ; Pacific Biosciences of California is required to E-FILE the amended document (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2011)
December 28, 2011 Filing 73 Opposition to Life's Motion to Compel re #66 filed byPacific Biosciences of California, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eldora Ellison in Support of Pacific Biosciences Opposition to Lifes Motion to Compel, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Eldora Ellison in Support of Pacific Biosciences Opposition to Lifes Motion to Compel, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Eldora Ellison in Support of Pacific Biosciences Opposition to Lifes Motion to Compel, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Eldora Ellison in Support of Pacific Biosciences Opposition to Lifes Motion to Compel)(Ellison, Eldora) (Filed on 12/28/2011) Modified on 12/29/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
December 28, 2011 Filing 72 Consent MOTION to for Leave to Amend Cross-Action Complaint re #11 filed by Pacific Biosciences of California, Inc. Responses due by 1/11/2012. Replies due by 1/18/2012. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 (Proposed) Order) (Ellison, Eldora) (Filed on 12/28/2011) Modified on 12/29/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
December 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER GRANTING LIFE'S REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting #69 Motion to Appear by Telephone (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2011)
December 22, 2011 Filing 70 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel filed Pacific Biosciences of California (O'Hara, Gregory) (Filed on 12/22/2011) Modified on 12/22/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
December 20, 2011 Filing 69 Request to Appear Telephonically at Hearing of Motion to Compel filed by Life Technologies Corporation. (Ladow, Daniel) (Filed on 12/20/2011) Modified on 12/21/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER (AS MODIFIED) GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION SHORTENING TIME re #63 Stipulation filed by Life Technologies Corporation. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on December 19, 2011. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2011)
December 16, 2011 Filing 67 (Proposed) Order Granting Motion to Compel re #66 by Life Technologies Corporation. (Ladow, Daniel) (Filed on 12/16/2011) Modified on 12/19/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
December 16, 2011 Filing 66 Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof filed by Life Technologies Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 1/17/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 12/30/2011. Replies due by 1/6/2012. (Ladow, Daniel) (Filed on 12/16/2011) Modified on 12/19/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
December 16, 2011 Filing 65 Declaration of Daniel A. Ladow In Support of Life's Motion to Compel re #66 filed by Life Technologies Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Ladow, Daniel) (Filed on 12/16/2011) Linkage added on 12/19/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
December 16, 2011 Filing 64 Declaration of Daniel A. Ladow in Support of #63 Stipulation Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Shortening Time filed byLife Technologies Corporation. *** EXHIBITS FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD. *** (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #63 ) (Ladow, Daniel) (Filed on 12/16/2011) Modified on 12/16/2011 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
December 16, 2011 Filing 63 Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Shortening Time by Life Technologies Corporation. (Ladow, Daniel) (Filed on 12/16/2011) Modified on 12/19/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
December 15, 2011 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance of Michael Joseph Malecek, Esq as counsel for Pacific Bioscience of California, Inc. (Malecek, Michael) (Filed on 12/15/2011) Modified on 12/15/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
December 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER GRANTING (AS MODIFIED) JOINT MOTION TO MODIFY THE SCHEDULE by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting #60 Motion to Expedite (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2011) Modified on 12/8/2011 (ofr, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/17/2012 (ofr, COURT STAFF).
December 5, 2011 Filing 60 Joint MOTION to Modify the Schedule filed by Pacific Biosciences of California, Inc. (Ellison, Eldora) (Filed on 12/5/2011) Modified on 12/7/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 30, 2011 Filing 59 Notice of Withdrawal of Bradford Paul Schmidt As Counsel for Life Technologies Corporation by Life Technologies Corporation (Veravanich, Polaphat) (Filed on 11/30/2011) Modified on 11/30/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 21, 2011 Filing 58 CERTIFICATION OF MEDIATION Session by Mediator, Nathan Lane, Mediation session held 10/20/2011; Case did not settle; No further facilitated discussions expected; Mediation process is complete. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2011)
October 6, 2011 Filing 57 Notice of Disassociation of Counsel by Life Technologies Corporation (Veravanich, Polaphat) (Filed on 10/6/2011) Modified on 10/6/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 6, 2011 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance of Bradford Paul Schmidt by Life Technologies Corporation (Schmidt, Bradford) (Filed on 10/6/2011) Modified on 10/6/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 55 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on September 28, 2011. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2011)
September 20, 2011 Filing 54 Minute Entry: Case Management Conference held on 9/20/2011 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. Case management conference scheduling order to be issued. (Date Filed: 9/20/2011). (Court Reporter FTR: (2:08 to 2:26.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/20/2011)
September 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER GRANTING LIFE TECHNOLOGIES' REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting #52 Motion to Appear by Telephone (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2011)
September 13, 2011 Filing 52 Request to Appear Telephonically at Case Management Conference; and (Proposed) Order filed by Life Technologies Corporation. (Veravanich, Polaphat) (Filed on 9/13/2011) Modified on 9/14/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 13, 2011 Filing 51 Second Joint Case Management Statement filed by Life Technologies Corporation. (Veravanich, Polaphat) (Filed on 9/13/2011) Modified on 9/14/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 8, 2011 Filing 50 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Conference set for 9/20/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. Case Management Statement due by 9/13/2011. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2011)
September 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: IN-PERSON SETTLEMENT DISCUSSION DEADLINE re #48 Stipulation filed by Life Technologies Corporation. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on September 8, 2011. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2011)
September 2, 2011 Filing 48 STIPULATION Re: In-Person Settlement Discussion Deadline and (Proposed) Order by Life Technologies Corporation. (Veravanich, Polaphat) (Filed on 9/2/2011) Modified on 9/6/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2011 Pursuant to Signed Order of Reassignment ( #47 ). Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal for all further proceedings. Judge Lucy H. Koh no longer assigned to the case. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2011)
August 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER REFERRING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT TO THE HONORABLE MAGISTRATE JUDGE PAUL S. GREWAL FOR ALL PURPOSES PURSUANT TO PARTIES' CONSENT. Signed by Judge Koh on 8/19/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2011)
August 16, 2011 Filing 46 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Life Technologies Corporation.. (Veravanich, Polaphat) (Filed on 8/16/2011)
August 16, 2011 Filing 45 ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Nathan Lane as Mediator. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2011)
August 12, 2011 Filing 44 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Pacific Biosciences of California, Inc.. (Cole, Lisa) (Filed on 8/12/2011)
August 10, 2011 Filing 43 Minute Entry and Case Management Order: Initial Case Management Conference held on 8/10/2011 before Judge Lucy H. Koh (Date Filed: 8/10/2011). Bench Trial set for 11/5/2012 09:00 AM before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/30/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/17/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/10/2011)
August 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting #39 Motion to Appear by Telephone (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2011)
August 4, 2011 Filing 41 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Corrected Statement filed by Life Technologies Corporation. (Veravanich, Polaphat) (Filed on 8/4/2011)
August 3, 2011 Filing 40 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Life Technologies Corporation. (Veravanich, Polaphat) (Filed on 8/3/2011)
August 2, 2011 Filing 39 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Initial Case Management Conference filed by Life Technologies Corporation. (Veravanich, Polaphat) (Filed on 8/2/2011)
July 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION and ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Judge Koh on 7/21/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2011)
July 21, 2011 Filing 37 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Life Technologies Corporation (Ladow, Daniel) (Filed on 7/21/2011)
July 20, 2011 Filing 36 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Pacific Biosciences of California, Inc. (Cole, Lisa) (Filed on 7/20/2011)
July 20, 2011 Filing 35 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Life Technologies (Veravanich, Polaphat) (Filed on 7/20/2011)
June 6, 2011 Filing 34 ANSWER to Crossclaim re #11 by Life Technologies Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Veravanich, Polaphat) (Filed on 6/6/2011)Linkage added on 9/6/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
May 23, 2011 Filing 33 ANSWER to Complaint re #1 by Pacific Biosciences of California, Inc. (Cole, Lisa) (Filed on 5/23/2011) Linkage added on 9/6/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge Koh Granting #27 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Eldora Ellison. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2011)
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge Koh Granting #25 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Mark Evens. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2011)
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge Koh Granting #23 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Byron Pickard. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2011)
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge Koh Granting #21 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Deborah Sterling. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2011)
May 2, 2011 Filing 28 Proposed Order re #27 APPLICATION of Eldora L. Ellison for Admission Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 54611009580) by Pacific Biosciences of California, Inc. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2011)
May 2, 2011 Filing 27 APPLICATION of Eldora L. Ellison for Admission Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 54611009580) filed by Pacific Biosciences of California, Inc. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2011)
May 2, 2011 Filing 26 Proposed Order re #25 APPLICATION of Mark Fox Evens for Admission Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 54611009580) by Pacific Biosciences of California, Inc. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2011)
May 2, 2011 Filing 25 APPLICATION of Mark Fox Evens for Admission Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 54611009580) filed by Pacific Biosciences of California, Inc. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2011)
May 2, 2011 Filing 24 Proposed Order re #23 APPLICATION of Byron L. Pickard for Admission Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 54611009580) by Pacific Biosciences of California, Inc. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2011)
May 2, 2011 Filing 23 APPLICATION of Byron L. Pickard for Admission Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 54611009580) filed by Pacific Biosciences of California, Inc. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2011) Modified text on 5/3/2011 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
May 2, 2011 Filing 22 Proposed Order re #21 APPLICATION of Deborah Sterling for Admission Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 54611009580) by Pacific Biosciences of California, Inc. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2011)
May 2, 2011 Filing 21 APPLICATION of Deborah Sterling for Admission Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 54611009580) filed by Pacific Biosciences of California, Inc. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2011)
April 29, 2011 Filing 20 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Case Management Statement due by 8/3/2011. Case Management Conference set for 8/10/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2011)
April 26, 2011 Filing 19 CORRECTED STIPULATION re #15 to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint and Cross-Action by Pacific Biosciences of California, Inc. (Cole, Lisa) (Filed on 4/26/2011) Modified text on 5/4/2011 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
April 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings and Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd for all discovery matters. Signed by The Executive Committee on 4/26/2011. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2011)
April 22, 2011 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2011)
April 22, 2011 Filing 16 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge and Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge by Life Technologies Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Veravanich, Polaphat) (Filed on 4/22/2011) Modified on 4/22/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 22, 2011 ***Deadlines terminated. #17 Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment. (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2011)
April 21, 2011 Filing 15 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint re ( #1 ) and Cross-Action by Pacific Biosciences of California, Inc. (Cole, Lisa) (Filed on 4/21/2011) Modified on 4/22/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 18, 2011 Filing 14 Remark: Clerk mailed Pacer Registration Forms to attorneys who were not electronically notified of filing. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2011)
April 14, 2011 Filing 13 *** PLEASE DISREGARD FILED IN ERROR*** NOTICE by Pacific Biosciences of California, Inc Report on the Filing or Determination of An Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (Cole, Lisa) (Filed on 4/14/2011) Modified on 4/18/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 14, 2011 Filing 12 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement Pacific Biosciences of California, Inc (Cole, Lisa) (Filed on 4/14/2011) Modified on 4/18/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 14, 2011 Filing 11 Cross-Action Complaint of Pacific Biosciences of California, Inc. against Life Technologies Corporation. Filed byPacific Biosciences of California, Inc. (Cole, Lisa) (Filed on 4/14/2011) Modified on 4/18/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting #5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Daniel A. Ladow. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2011)
April 7, 2011 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement and Disclosure of Non-party Interested Entities by Life Technologies Corporation (Veravanich, Polaphat) (Filed on 4/7/2011) Modified on 4/7/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 7, 2011 Filing 8 Proof of Serice as to defendant Pacific Biosciences of California, Inc served on 3/31/2011, answer due 4/21/2011 by Life Technologies Corporation. (Veravanich, Polaphat) (Filed on 4/7/2011) Text modified on 4/7/2011 conforming to posted document caption; incorrect event type used when posting document (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/11/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 7, 2011 Filing 7 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Patent Infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2011)
April 6, 2011 Filing 6 (Proposed) Order Granting Application for Admission of Attorney Daniel A. Ladow to appear in Pro Hac Vice re #5 by Life Technologies Corporation. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2011)
April 6, 2011 Filing 5 Application for Admission of Attorney Daniel A. Ladow to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 54611009427) filed by Life Technologies Corporation. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2011)
April 4, 2011 Filing 4 CLERKS NOTICE re: Failure to E-File and/or Failure to Register as an E-Filer On March 31, 2011, counsel for Plaintiff filed a Complaint manually, on paper. This case has been designated for electronic filing, pursuant to Local Rule 5-4 and General Order 45.The above mentioned paper document has been filed and docketed. However, General Order 45 provides at Section III that cases assigned to judges who participate in the e-filing program shall be presumptively designated as e-filing cases. Therefore, counsel for Plaintiff should submit the Complaint, in PDF format within 10 days, as an attachment in an e-mail message directed to the judges chamber's "PDF" email box listed at http://ecf.cand.uscourts.gov (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2011)
March 31, 2011 Filing 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 6/21/2011. Case Management Conference set for 6/28/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/4/2011: #1 Judge Howard R. Lloyd Standing Order re Initial Case Management and Discovery Disputes, #2 San Jose Division Judges Standing Orders, #3 Standing Orders for Judges of the Northern District of California) (bw, COURT STAFF).
March 31, 2011 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Pacific Bioscience of California, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2011) (bw, COURT STAFF).
March 31, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Summons Issued) against Pacific Biosciences of California, Inc ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611058142). Filed by Life Technologies Corporation. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2011) Modified on 4/4/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
March 31, 2011 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Life Technologies Corporation v. Pacific Biosciences of California, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Life Technologies Corporation
Represented By: Bradford Paul Schmidt
Represented By: Polaphat Veravanich
Represented By: Daniel A. Ladow
Represented By: Kurtis David MacFerrin
Represented By: Matthew Daniel Murphey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Biosciences of California, Inc
Represented By: Byron L Pickard
Represented By: Deborah A Sterling
Represented By: Eldora L. Ellison
Represented By: Gregory Paul O'Hara
Represented By: Mark Fox Evens
Represented By: Michael Joseph Malecek, Esq.
Represented By: Robert Edward Krebs
Represented By: Lisa A. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?