Hoffman v. County of Santa Clara

Plaintiff: Todd Hoffman
Defendant: County of Santa Clara
 
Case Number: 5:2011cv01622
Filed: April 4, 2011
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
 
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 29, 2011 14 Featured Case ORDER REQUIRING JOINT STATUS STATEMENT Status Report due by 10/11/2011. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/29/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2011)
December 20, 2011 16 Featured Case ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Case Management Statement due by 1/20/2012. Case Management Conference set for 1/30/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/20/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2011)
January 24, 2012 18 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER Preliminary Pretrial Conference Statement due by 6/29/2012. Discovery due by 8/13/2012. Motion Hearing set for 10/15/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. Pretrial Conference set for 7/9/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. ADR deadline 2/10/12. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/24/12. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2012)
March 26, 2012 21 Featured Case ORDER VACATING PRETRIAL DATES; SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE RE: SETTLEMENT Joint Status Conference Statement or Stipulated Dismissal due by 5/11/2012. Status Conference set for 5/21/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/26/12. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2012)
May 14, 2012 23 Featured Case ORDER CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE RE. SETTLEMENT Stipulated Dismissal or Joint Status Report due by 6/1/2012. Status Conference set for 6/11/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on May 14, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2012)
June 5, 2012 25 Featured Case ORDER CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE RE. SETTLEMENT. Stipulated Dismissal or Joint Status Statement due by 6/29/2012. Status Conference set for 7/9/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Chief Judge James Ware on June 5, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2012)
July 3, 2012 27 Featured Case ORDER ORDER VACATING CONFERENCE RE. SETTLEMENT; SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF STIPULATED DISMISSAL. Stipulated Dismissal due by 7/31/2012. Signed by Chief Judge James Ware on July 3, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2012)
July 26, 2012 29 Featured Case ORDER AND JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND GENERAL RELEASE. Signed by Judge James Ware on July 26, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2012)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hoffman v. County of Santa Clara
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Hoffman
Represented By: Michael Andrew McGill
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Santa Clara
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]