Olympic Development AG, LLC v. Amazon.com, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Olympic Development AG, LLC |
Defendant: |
Apple, Inc., Barnesandnoble.com, Inc., Sony Electronics, Inc. and Amazon.com, Inc. |
Case Number: |
5:2011cv01655 |
Filed: |
April 6, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of California |
Office: |
San Jose Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
Edward J. Davila |
Nature of Suit: |
Patent |
Cause of Action: |
35 U.S.C. ยง 271 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 8, 2014 |
Filing
155
STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING 154 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTBARNESANDNOBLE.COM LLC without Prejudice filed by Barnesandnoble.com, LLC. *** TERMINATED AS MOOT: 153 Stipulation filed by Barnesandnoble.com, LLC. Barnesandnoble.com, LLC terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/8/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2014)
|
November 14, 2011 |
Filing
147
STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT REGARDING 146 STIPULATION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING REEXAMINATION OF PATENT-IN-SUIT. This action is STAYED in its entirety pending completion of the ex parte reexamination of the '585 patent. A ll hearing dates, Case Management Conferences, and other deadlines previously imposed are VACATED. The Clerk shall ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this matter. The parties shall submit a joint status report on or before April 10, 2012, apprising the court of the status of the reexamination proceedings and shall continue to do so every six months thereafter. Upon the completion of the reexamination proceedings, the parties may request that this matter be reopened and that a case management conference be scheduled. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/14/2011. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2011)
|
November 1, 2011 |
Filing
145
ORDER Granting Modification of Case Management Dates re 144 Stipulation. Close of Claim Construction Discovery due by 3/19/2012. Interim Case Management Statement due by 4/10/2012. Interim Case Management Conference set for 4/20/2012 10:00 AM in C ourtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose. Tutorial and Claim Construction Hearing set for 5/30/2012 in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose. B&N agrees to withdraw its pending motion to stay (Docket No. 143) without prejudice and may re-notice and re-file such motion at its discretion. The Clerk shall terminate Docket Item No. 143. Motions terminated: 143 MOTION to Stay filed by Barnesandnoble.com, LLC. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/1/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2011)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?