Navarro v. Sterkel et al
Plaintiff: Jon Derrick Navarro
Defendant: Chris Bell, Chris Pilger, Mike Garcia and Bryan Sterkel
Case Number: 5:2011cv01700
Filed: April 7, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER VACATING STATUS CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/10/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2012)
November 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 72 STIIPULATION. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/2/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2012)
October 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 61 VERDICT FORM. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 10/29/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2012)
September 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/10/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2012)
September 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/4/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2012)
August 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 28 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2012)
November 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT ENE. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 11/30/2011. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Navarro v. Sterkel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Bell
Represented By: Michael C. Serverian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Pilger
Represented By: Michael C. Serverian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Garcia
Represented By: Michael C. Serverian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Sterkel
Represented By: Michael C. Serverian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Derrick Navarro
Represented By: Che Lewellyn Hashim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?