Friedman v. Apple, Inc. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Aaron Friedman
Defendant: Apple, Inc., AT&T Mobility, LLC and Does
Case Number: 5:2011cv01875
Filed: April 20, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2011 Filing 29 Transcript of Proceedings held on 07-15-11, before Judge Ronald M. Whyte. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/9/2011. (las, ) (Filed on 8/11/2011)
July 28, 2011 ***Deadlines terminated. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2011)
May 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER 89 for Consolidation to Master Case C-10-02553-RMW. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 5/31/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2011) Modified on 6/9/2011 (jg, COURT STAFF).
April 19, 2011 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2011)
April 19, 2011 Filing 27 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 7/29/2011. Case Management Conference set for 8/5/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Judge Ronald M. Whyte: Standing Order re Pretrial Preparation, # 2 Standing Orders for San Jose Division Judges, # 3 Standing Orders for Judges of the Northern District of California)(bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2011)
April 19, 2011 Filing 26 Case transferred in from District of California Southern; Case Number 3:10-cv-02403. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Modified on 4/20/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 18, 2011 Filing 25 Case transferred to United States District Court, Northern District of California, San Jose Division. Files transferred electronically to: *United States District Court, Northern District of California, San Jose Division*.*280 South 1st Street**San Jose, CA 95113*. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/18/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lmt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/18/2011: # 1 Transfer Order) (lmt).
April 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting Joint Motion to Change Venue: The Clerk of this Court is to close the file in this Court and to transfer the file to the United States District Court, Northern District of California, San Jose Division. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/18/11. (lmt)
April 14, 2011 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple, Inc. re 22 MOTION for Change Venue Joint Motion to Transfer Action to Northern District of California, San Jose Division (Preovolos, Penelope) (lmt).
April 14, 2011 Filing 22 Joint MOTION for Change Venue Joint Motion to Transfer Action to Northern District of California, San Jose Division by Apple, Inc.. (Preovolos, Penelope) (lmt).
April 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting 19 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint; AT&T Mobility, LLC answer due 5/31/2011; Apple, Inc. answer due 5/31/2011; Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 3/30/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kaj) (jcj).
March 29, 2011 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple, Inc. re 19 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Class Action Complaint Amended Certificate of Service (Preovolos, Penelope) (lmt).
March 29, 2011 Filing 19 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Class Action Complaint by Apple, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Preovolos, Penelope) (lmt).
March 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule as to 15 MOTION for Change Venue: Plaintiff shall file an opposition on or before 4/8/11. Defendant, if it wishes, shall file a reply on or before 4/15/11. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 3/8/11.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lmt) (jcj).
March 7, 2011 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple, Inc. re 16 Declaration (Preovolos, Penelope) (lmt).
March 7, 2011 Filing 16 DECLARATION re 15 MOTION for Change Venue Corrected Declaration of Stuart Plunkett by Defendant Apple, Inc.. (Preovolos, Penelope) (lmt).
March 4, 2011 Filing 15 MOTION for Change Venue by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration D. House, # 3 Declaration S. Plunkett, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Exhibit D, # 8 Exhibit E, # 9 Exhibit F, # 10 Exhibit G, # 11 Exhibit H, # 12 Exhibit I, # 13 Exhibit J, # 14 Proof of Service)(Preovolos, Penelope). Modified on 3/7/2011 - Plunkett Declaration has s/ signature. Email sent to Atty to file Corrected Declaration of S. Plunkett. Removed duplicate text (jah).
February 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting 12 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: AT&T Mobility, LLC answer due 4/1/2011; Apple, Inc. answer due 4/1/2011. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 2/25/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (lmt) (jrl).
February 24, 2011 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple, Inc. re 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Joint Motion to Further Extend Defendants' Time to Respond to Class Action Complaint (Preovolos, Penelope) (lmt).
February 24, 2011 Filing 12 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Joint Motion to Further Extend Defendants' Time to Respond to Class Action Complaint by Apple, Inc. (Preovolos, Penelope) (lmt).
January 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting 9 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Responde to Class Action Complaint: AT&T Mobility, LLC answer due 3/2/2011; Apple, Inc. answer due 3/2/2011. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 1/25/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lmt)
January 24, 2011 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple, Inc. re 7 Notice of Appearance, 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Joint Motion to Extend Defendants' Time to Respond to Class Action Complaint, 8 Notice of Party With Financial Interest and [Proposed] Order Granting Joint Motion to Extend Defendants' Time to Respond to Class Action Complaint (Preovolos, Penelope) (lmt).
January 24, 2011 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Joint Motion to Extend Defendants' Time to Respond to Class Action Complaint by Apple, Inc.. (Preovolos, Penelope) Modified to correct event on 1/25/2011 (lmt).
January 24, 2011 Filing 8 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Apple, Inc. (Preovolos, Penelope) (lmt).
January 24, 2011 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Penelope A. Preovolos on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Preovolos, Penelope) (lmt).
January 4, 2011 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Aaron Friedman. AT&T Mobility, LLC waiver sent on 11/30/2010, answer due 1/31/2011. (Blatt, Gayle) (lmt).
January 4, 2011 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Aaron Friedman. Apple, Inc. waiver sent on 11/30/2010, answer due 1/31/2011. (Blatt, Gayle) (lmt).
December 3, 2010 Filing 4 Minute Order: Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major recuses from this case and request a new Magistrate Judge be randomly drawn and assigned. Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo randomly assigned to this case. The new case number is 10cv2403 JLS WVG.(yeb)
December 1, 2010 Filing 3 Minute Order: Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major added to the case. Magistrate Judge Louisa S Porter is no longer assigned to case and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major is now assigned to the case. The new case number is 10cv2403-JLS (BLM). Signed by Magistrate Judge Louisa S Porter on 12/1/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lmt) (mam).
November 22, 2010 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (smy) (jcj).
November 22, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against AT&T Mobility, LLC, Apple, Inc., DOES (Filing fee $350, receipt number 0974-3088255), filed by Aaron Friedman. [Atty Maint]The new case number is 3:10-cv-2403-JLS-POR. Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge Louisa S Porter are assigned to the case. (Blatt, Gayle)(smy) (jcj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Friedman v. Apple, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Friedman
Represented By: Gayle M Blatt
Represented By: Michael Ian Rott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Represented By: Penelope Athene Preovolos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Mobility, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?