Garrison v. Brown, et al
Plaintiff: Steve Garrison
Defendant: CDCR (State Parole Baord of Prison Terms), Doe, Jerry Brown and Alameda Sheriff's Department
Case Number: 5:2011cv01901
Filed: April 20, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 74 JUDGMENT. The Court has dismissed the instant civil rights action without leave to amend. A judgment of dismissal with prejudice is entered. The Clerk shall close the file. ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/7/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2013)
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER ADDRESSING PENDING MOTIONS. Motions terminated: 65 MOTION for the court to inform the jail of his rights filed by Steve Garrison, 60 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Steve Garrison, 64 MOTION for the court to issue warrants for all defendants filed by Steve Garrison. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/6/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2012)
January 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING SECOND EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT. On November 15, 2011, Plaintiff filed a letter requesting additional time to file his amended complaint. (Docket No. 26 .) Good cause appearing, Plaintiff's second request for an extension of time GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file his amended complaint no later than January 13, 2012. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/30/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2012)
November 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT. On October 18, 2011, Plaintiff filed a letter requesting additional time to file his amended complaint. (Docket No. 24.) Although Plaintiff's motion is untimely, for good cause shown and in the interest of justice, Plaintiffs request is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file his amended complaint no later than thirty (30) days from the date this order is filed. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/8/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2011)
August 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 7/29/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2011)
June 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE COMPLETE IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/8/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garrison v. Brown, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CDCR (State Parole Baord of Prison Terms)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alameda Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?