Pragmatus AV, LLC v. Facebook, Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Pragmatus AV, LLC
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2011cv02168
Filed: May 6, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2011 Filing 16 Memorandum in Support re 15 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Justin P.D. Wilcox, # 2 Exhibit A)(Wilcox, Justin)
January 25, 2011 Filing 15 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wilcox, Justin)
January 25, 2011 Notice of Correction re 10 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement: The document contains more than one motion. Counsel has been requested to file the document again as a motion for more definite statement. (mwin, )
January 21, 2011 Filing 14 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Facebook, Inc.. (Wilcox, Justin)
January 21, 2011 Filing 13 Memorandum in Support re 12 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Facebook Declaration, # 2 Wilcox Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 12, # 15 Exhibit 13, # 16 Exhibit 14)(Wilcox, Justin)
January 21, 2011 Filing 12 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wilcox, Justin)
January 21, 2011 Filing 11 Memorandum in Support re 10 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Justin P.D. Wilcox, # 2 Exhibit A to the Wilcox Declaration)(Wilcox, Justin)
January 21, 2011 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss (or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement ) by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wilcox, Justin) Modified on 2/10/2011 to note: SEE separate Motion for More Definite Statement (Document 15) (mwin, ).
January 21, 2011 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Patrick Daniel Wilcox on behalf of Facebook, Inc. (Wilcox, Justin)
January 21, 2011 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Allen Cole on behalf of Facebook, Inc. (Cole, Scott)
January 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time to File; Facebook, Inc. will have up to and including January 21, 2011, to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Bradford Stillman and filed on 01/13/11. (rlam)
January 13, 2011 MOTION REFERRED to Magistrate Judge F. Bradford Stillman: 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Motion by Plaintiff to Extend Time for Defendant to Answer. Defendant has not made an appearance.) (mwin, )
January 12, 2011 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 5 Summons Returned Executed, 1 Complaint, Agreed Motion by Plaintiff Pragmatus AV, LLC to Extend Time for Defendant Facebook, Inc. to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by Pragmatus AV, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wasserman, Mark)
December 20, 2010 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Facebook, Inc. served on 12/17/2010, (lwoo)
November 18, 2010 Filing 4 AO 120 Report on the filing of an action regarding a patent, re Patent numbers 7,421,470 and 7,433,921, sent electronically to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (mwin, )
November 18, 2010 Filing 3 Original Summons Issued as to Facebook, Inc.; one service copy with attached copy of complaint and attachments noted below. Summons package mailed to plaintiff's counsel. (Attachments: # 1 Magistrate Judge notice and Judge's information(mwin, )
November 15, 2010 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Pragmatus AV, LLC. (mwin, )
November 15, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pragmatus AV, LLC (Filing fee $350, receipt number 1468301708) filed by Pragmatus AV, LLC in Alexandria Division 11/15/10; patent case assigned to Norfolk Division; received in Norfolk 11/17/10. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Receipt, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(mwin, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pragmatus AV, LLC v. Facebook, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pragmatus AV, LLC
Represented By: Brent Ryan Gary
Represented By: Matthew Robertson Sheldon
Represented By: Mark Wayne Wasserman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: Scott Allen Cole
Represented By: Heidi Lyn Keefe
Represented By: Michael Graham Rhodes
Represented By: Mark R. Weinstein
Represented By: Justin Patrick Daniel Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?