Free Freehand Corp et al v. Adobe Systems, Inc. Featured Case

Macromedia Freehand software users filed an antitrust lawsuit against Adobe Systems, alleging that since it acquired Macromedia and its Freehand vector graphics illustration software product, that Adobe has engaged in an "unlawful scheme" affecting graphic designers by having a monopoly on graphic illustration software with Adobe Illustrator, and that it must release the software code to Freehand.

Plaintiff: Free Freehand Corp, Jabez Palmer, Eric Rosenberg, Mark Oliver, Inc and Jamie Pritchett
Defendant: Adobe Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2011cv02174
Filed: May 3, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:2
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 56 Stipulation.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2012)
May 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 54 Stipulation.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2012)
May 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 52 Stipulation.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2012)
May 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 50 Stipulation.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2012)
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 45 Stipulation, as modified.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2012)
February 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 36 Stipulation selecting Mediation.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2012)
February 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 20 Motion to Dismiss.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2012)
November 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER REGARDING ADR PROCESS. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/22/2011. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Free Freehand Corp et al v. Adobe Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Free Freehand Corp
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared Harrison Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jabez Palmer
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared Harrison Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Rosenberg
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared Harrison Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Oliver, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Pritchett
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared Harrison Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adobe Systems, Inc.
Represented By: David Craig Kiernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?