Adobe Systems Incorporation v. Wowza Media Systems, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff alleged that Defendant's Wowza Media Server includes unauthorized versions of RTMP and RTMPe, and infringe U.S. Patent No. 7,272,658 and 7,587,509, both entitled "Real-time priority-based media communication."

Plaintiff: Adobe Systems Incorporation
Defendant: Wowza Media Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2011cv02243
Filed: May 6, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Jeremy Fogel for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on May 12, 2011. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2011)
May 11, 2011 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2011)
May 10, 2011 Filing 8 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Adobe Systems Incorporation. (Steinberg, Robert) (Filed on 5/10/2011)
May 10, 2011 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Adobe Systems Incorporation. (Steinberg, Robert) (Filed on 5/10/2011) Modified on 5/11/2011 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2011 Filing 6 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Patent (cc: form mailed to register). (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2011)
May 6, 2011 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2011)
May 6, 2011 Filing 5 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 10/6/2011. Case Management Conference set for 10/13/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2011)
May 6, 2011 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Wowza Media Systems, Inc. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2011)
May 6, 2011 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement by Adobe Systems Incorporation. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2011)
May 6, 2011 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Adobe Systems Incorporation. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2011)
May 6, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (with jury demand) against Wowza Media Systems, Inc. (Filing fee $350, receipt number 54611009626). Filed by Adobe Systems Incorporation. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2011) (srm, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adobe Systems Incorporation v. Wowza Media Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adobe Systems Incorporation
Represented By: Jennifer L. Barry
Represented By: Ryan Ephraim Hatch
Represented By: Robert Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wowza Media Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Martin C. Fliesler
Represented By: Joseph Patrick O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?