Rose v. Bank of America Corporation
Plaintiff: Stephanie Rose
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation and FIA Card Services, N.A.
Case Number: 5:2011cv02390
Filed: May 16, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER denying 113 Objectors' Motion for Attorneys' Fees. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/18/2015. (ejdlc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2015)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER denying 110 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/1/2015. (ejdlc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2015)
August 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 73 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting 74 Motion for Settlement. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/29/2014. (ejdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2014)
July 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting 92 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/14/2014. (ejdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2014)
December 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting (59) Motion for Preliminary Approval. Final approval hearing scheduled for April 4, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/6/2013. (ejdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2013)
October 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT RE (61 in 5:11-cv-02390-EJD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re (59) MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs Notice of Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement Expediting Hearing filed by Stephanie Rose. Set/Reset Deadlines as to (59 in 5:11-cv-02390-EJD) MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs Notice of Motion and Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement: Motion Hearing set for 11/8/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, going forward, the parties must file documents in both case numbers to the extend such documents apply to both case numbers because these cases are related, stand-alone cases and have not been consolidated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/11/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2013)
September 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall file the Motion for Preliminary Approval as to both cases on or before 9/27/2013. This is a final deadline. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, should the parties not file the Motion for Preliminary Approval as ordered, the court will immediately issue an expedited scheduling order with dates chosen solely by the court. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/13/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2013)
September 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER CLARIFYING ORDER REQUIRING APPEARANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE. One attorney on behalf of each party in each case must appear personally. The court does not require the personal appearance of all counsel for each party. Counsel shall be prepare d to:(1) explain why a Motion for Preliminary Approval has not yet been filed despite the courts instructions, on several occasions, that one be filed;(2) propose a final deadline for the filing of a Motion for Preliminary Approval in no less than 30 days from the date of the conference, which if not met, will result in these actions either being dismissed or restored to court's active case calendar on an expedited case schedule determined solely by the court. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/12/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2013)
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT re 52 Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Continue Status Conference filed by Bank of America Corporation, Stephanie Rose, FIA Card Services, N.A. Status Conference set for 9/13/2 013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. All counsel in both cases must appear personally at the status conference on 9/13 unless the motion for preliminary approval is filed prior to that date. The court will no t consider further requests for a continuance of the status conference or requests to appear telephonically. This order shall be filed in both case numbers. **7/12/2013 Status Conference Deadlines terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/10/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2013)
June 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER VACATING PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. In light of the Status Conference scheduled for the same date which presently remains on calendar, the Preliminary Pretrial Conference previously scheduled for 7/12/2013 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/28/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2013)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; SETTING MOTION HEARING. Anticipated motion for preliminary approval of class action Settlement set for 5/17/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. In light of this anticipated hearing, the court will not reschedule the Case Management Conferences. However, the parties may submit a stipulation to reset the conferences if circumstances prove necessary. *** 2/15/2013 Deadlines terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/12/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2013)
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER 12/7/2012 CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 42 Joint Case Management Statement filed by Bank of America Corporation, ***12/7/2012 CMC Deadlines terminated. Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/8/2013. Case Management Conference set for 2/15/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/4/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2012)
October 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Order Granting 39 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference; Staying Discovery. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 10/10/2012. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 10/10/2012.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2012)
September 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER referring Case No. C12-4009 TEH to Judge Edward Davila to consider whether it is related to this case. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 09/14/12. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2012)
January 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Case Management ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on January 17, 2012. (ejdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rose v. Bank of America Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Rose
Represented By: Douglas James Campion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIA Card Services, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?