Monroe v. Apple, Inc
Plaintiff: Twilah Monroe
Defendant: Apple, Inc
Case Number: 5:2011cv02394
Filed: May 16, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO CLOSE FILE. The above-entitled action was previously consolidated into In re Apple In-App Purchase Litigation, Case No. 5:11-cv-01758 EJD, but was inadvertently left open. Accordingly, the Clerk is directed to close this file. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/23/2014. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2014)
July 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SECOND REVISED STIPULATION AND ORDER RE CONSOLIDATION OF CASES re 27 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 7/5/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
May 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING AMENDED APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY SARAH SCHALMAN-BERGEN PRO HAC VICE re 12 Amended Document filed by Twilah Monroe. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on May 31, 2011. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Monroe v. Apple, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Twilah Monroe
Represented By: Michael J. Boni
Represented By: Shanon Jude Carson
Represented By: Gerard A Dever
Represented By: Christopher T. Heffelfinger
Represented By: Jeffrey Steven Istvan
Represented By: Roberta D. Liebenberg
Represented By: Sarah Rebecca Schalman-Bergen
Represented By: Jonathan Shub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc
Represented By: Stuart Christopher Plunkett
Represented By: Penelope Athene Preovolos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?