Marks v. Martel

Petitioner: Delaney Geral Marks
Respondent: Michael Martel
Case Number: 5:2011cv02458
Filed: May 19, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER DENYING CLAIMS 13 and 22. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/18/17. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2017)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER Denying Claims 14 Through 21. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 6/27/17. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2017)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER DENYING CLAIM 12. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 6/1/17. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2017)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER DENYING CLAIM 10. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/15/16. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2016)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER Denying Claim 8. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/27/16. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2016)
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER Denying Claims 9 and 11. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/20/2016. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2016)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER Granting Respondent's Motion for Summary Judgment as to Claims 1, 6, and 7; Denying Petitioner's Motion for Summary Judgment as to Claims 1, 6, and 7. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/15/2016. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2016)
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER Re 66 . 67 Pro Se Filings. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 6/14/2016. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2016)
May 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER re Pro Se Filings. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 5/19/2016. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2016)
August 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/14/2015. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2015)
August 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER RE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/6/2015. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2015)
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/6/2015. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2015)
June 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER SETTING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 6/30/2015. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2015)
June 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 37 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 38 Motion for Summary Judgment (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2015)
May 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 42 Motion for Extension of Time to File (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2013)
April 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 39 Motion for Leave to File (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2013)
November 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER FOLLOWING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 34 Proposed Order filed by Kevin Chappelle. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/28/12. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2012)
November 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 30 Motion for Extension of Time to File (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2012)
September 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 27 Motion for Extension of Time to File and Continuing Case Management Conference from 10/17/12 to 11/14/12. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2012)
June 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 19 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Appl. for Second Enlarge. of time to File Answer to Petition (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2012)
May 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2012)
February 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER FOLLOWING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 2/28/12. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2012)
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL: The Court hereby appoints Habeas Corpus Resource Center, staffed specifically by attorneys Michael Laurence and Gary Sowards, to represent Petitioner Delany Marks. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/19/2011. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marks v. Martel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Delaney Geral Marks
Represented By: Michael David Laurence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michael Martel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?