EIT Holdings, LLC v. Linkedin Corporation Featured Case
Plaintiff: EIT Holdings, LLC
Defendant: Linkedin Corporation
Case Number: 5:2011cv02465
Filed: May 20, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2012 Case Stayed (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2012)
February 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER STAYING CASE PENDING APPEAL by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting 38 Stipulation (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2012)
January 25, 2012 Filing 38 JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER STAYING CASE PENDING APPEAL filed by Linkedin Corporation. (Kent, Ryan) (Filed on 1/25/2012) Modified on 1/25/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
January 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Tutorial Hearing set for 5/8/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. Claims Construction Hearing set for 5/14/2012 10:00 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 2/12/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Jury Trial set for 2/18/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 1/11/2012. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2012)
January 10, 2012 Filing 36 Minute Entry: Status Conference held. Court to issue scheduling order. (Date Filed: 1/10/2012). (Court Reporter FTR: (2:13 to 2:27.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/10/2012)
January 3, 2012 Filing 35 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT and Prehearing Statement Pursuant to Patent L.R. 4-3 filed by EIT Holdings, LLC. (Lipski, Alisa) (Filed on 1/3/2012)
January 3, 2012 Filing 34 Supplemental Joint Case Management Statement) filed by EIT Holdings, LLC. (Goldstein, Edward) (Filed on 1/3/2012) Modified on 1/5/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
December 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 PLAINTIFF EIT HOLDINGS LLC'S REQUEST AND ORDER TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, granting 32 Notice (Other), filed by EIT Holdings, LLC. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 12/27/2011. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2011)
December 21, 2011 Filing 32 Request and (Proposed) Order to Appear Telephonically For Case Management Conference by EIT Holdings, LLC (Goldstein, Edward) (Filed on 12/21/2011) Text modified on 12/21/2011 conforming to posted document caption; incorrect event type used when posting document (bw, COURT STAFF).
December 21, 2011 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance of Alisa Anne Lipski by EIT Holding, LLC(Lipski, Alisa) (Filed on 12/21/2011) Modified on 12/21/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
December 6, 2011 Filing 30 Minute Entry: Settlement Conference held on 12/6/11 before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Case did not settle. (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/6/2011)
November 1, 2011 Filing 29 Minute Entry: Status Conference held. (Date Filed: 11/1/2011). Further Status Conference set for 1/10/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (Court Reporter FTR: (2:04 to 2:07.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/1/2011)
October 31, 2011 Filing 28 CLERKS NOTICE RE: TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE: All parties requesting to appear telephonically for the status conference presently set for 11/1/2011 at 2:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal are directed to contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to arrange for a telephonic appearance. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2011)
October 25, 2011 Filing 27 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Supplemental Joint Case Management Statement and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) Report filed by EIT Holdings, LLC, Linkedin Corporation. (Goldstein, Edward) (Filed on 10/25/2011)
September 27, 2011 Filing 26 Notice of Settlement Conference and Order Setting Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Settlement Conference set for 12/6/2011 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 09/27/2011. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2011)
September 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero for Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on September 22, 2011. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2011)
September 12, 2011 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Linkedin Corpora tion (Novikov, Eugene) (Filed on 9/12/2011) Modified on 9/14/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 6, 2011 Filing 23 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 9/6/2011 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal (Date Filed: 9/6/2011). Status conference set for 11/1/11 at 2:00 p.m. to allow Judge Alsup to issue ruling on claim construction hearing presently set for 10/5/11 in prior filed Yelp matter. Deadlines prior to November 1st to remain in effect. (Court Reporter FTR: (2:51 to 2:57.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/6/2011)
September 2, 2011 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by HAH on 9/2/11. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2011)
August 30, 2011 Filing 22 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) Report filed by EIT Holdings, LLC, Linkedin Corporation. (Goldstein, Edward) (Filed on 8/30/2011)
August 23, 2011 Filing 21 ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 9/2/11 at 9:30 a.m. Pacific time. Please take note that at the appointed time, all parties shall call 218-339-2500 and use access code 1057593 to join the call. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2011)
August 18, 2011 Filing 20 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Goldstein, Edward) (Filed on 8/18/2011)
August 16, 2011 Filing 19 ADR Certification by Parties and Counsel (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options for Plaintiff EIT Holdings, LLC (Goldstein, Edward) (Filed on 8/16/2011) Modified on 8/18/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Approving 16 Stipulation To Continue Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on July 26, 2011. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2011)
July 26, 2011 Filing 17 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Linkedin Corporated. (Kent, Ryan) (Filed on 7/26/2011) Modified on 7/27/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 25, 2011 Filing 16 JOINT STIPULATED REQUEST AND [PROPOSED] ORDER CHANGING TIME OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Linkedin Corporated. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration) (Kent, Ryan) (Filed on 7/25/2011) Modified on 7/27/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 19, 2011 Filing 15 ADR Certification by Parties and Counsel (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by LinkedIn Corporation (Kent, Ryan) (Filed on 7/19/2011) Modified on 7/21/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 12, 2011 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: 8/9/2011 Case Management Conference reset to 8/2/2011 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. Joint Case Management Statement to be submitted no later than 7/26/2011. Each party who has not already done so shall file either a Consent or Declination to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge no later than 7/26/2011. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 13 ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM 11 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant LinkedIn Corporation byEIT Holdings, LLC. (Goldstein, Edward) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
June 21, 2011 Filing 12 Certification as to interested Parties by Linkedin Corporated identifying Corporate Parent Linkedin Corporation for Linkedin Corporated, Linkedin Corporated, Linkedin Corporated. (Kent, Ryan) (Filed on 6/21/2011) Modified on 6/22/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 21, 2011 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint re [ 1 ) with Jury Demand and Counterclaim to Plaintiff by Linkedin Corporated. (Kent, Ryan) (Filed on 6/21/2011) Modified on 6/22/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 14, 2011 Filing 10 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by EIT Holdings, LLC. (Goldstein, Edward) (Filed on 6/14/2011) Modified on 6/15/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 10, 2011 Filing 9 Order by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting 8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2011)
June 6, 2011 Filing 8 Application for Admission of Attorney Edward W. Goldstein Leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 54611009812.) filed by EIT Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 (Proposed) Order Granting Application for Admission of Attorney Edward W. Goldstein Leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice )(srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2011) Modified on 6/10/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 6, 2011 Filing 7 Certification as to Interested Parties by EIT Holdings, LLC (O'Mahoney, P.J.) (Filed on 6/6/2011) Modified on 6/10/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FINDING CASES TO BE UNRELATED, Order by Hon. William Alsup denying 5 Motion to Relate Case.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2011)
May 25, 2011 Remark : Clerk sent case file to CSA to WHA re ( 5 ) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2011)
May 24, 2011 Filing 5 MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related (10-5623WHA) filed by EIT Holdings, LLC. (O'Mahoney, P.J.) (Filed on 5/24/2011) Modified on 5/25/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
May 23, 2011 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Patent Infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2011)
May 20, 2011 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2011)
May 20, 2011 Filing 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 8/2/2011. Case Management Conference set for 8/9/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order for Civil Practice in Cases Assigned for All Purposes to Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal, # 2 U.S. Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal Settlement Conference Procedures, # 3 Standing Order for San Jose Division Judges, # 4 Standing Orders for Judges of the Northern District of California)(bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2011)
May 20, 2011 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Linkedin Corporated. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2011) (bw, COURT STAFF).
May 20, 2011 Filing 1 Original Complaint for Patent Infringement (Summons Issued) against Linkedin Corporated ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 54611009729). Filed byEIT Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Complaint, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet) bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EIT Holdings, LLC v. Linkedin Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EIT Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Edward W. Goldstein
Represented By: Mark W. Good
Represented By: P.J. Benedict O'Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linkedin Corporation
Represented By: Daralyn J. Durie
Represented By: Ryan Marshall Kent
Represented By: Eugene Novikov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?