Wang v. U.S. Airways, Inc. Featured Case

A US Airways passenger alleges that she and fellow passengers were forced to disembark from their plane into the rain onto a wet staircase and tarmack upon arrival at Silicon Valley's San Jose International Airport, and charges that she was injured due to the airline's negligence.

Plaintiff: Jing Fang Wang
Defendant: U.S. Airways, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2011cv02540
Filed: May 25, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2011 Filing 7 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by U.S. Airways, Inc... (Grotch, Richard) (Filed on 5/27/2011)
May 26, 2011 Filing 6 Proof of Service re Notice of Removal from the Santa Clara County Superior Court re 4 ADR Scheduling Order,, 3 Certificate of Interested Entities, 2 Jury Demand, 1 Notice of Removalby U.S. Airways, Inc (Grotch, Richard) (Filed on 5/26/2011) Modified on 5/27/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
May 26, 2011 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: 8/16/2011 Case Management Conference reset to 6/14/2011 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/7/2011. Each party who has not already done so shall file either a Consent" or "Declination" to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge no later than 6/7/2011. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/26/2011: # 1 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) (ofr, COURT STAFF).
May 25, 2011 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2011)
May 25, 2011 Filing 4 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 8/9/2011. Case Management Conference set for 8/16/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order for Civil Practice in Cases Assigned for All Purposes to Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal, # 2 U.S. Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal Settlement Conference Procedures, # 3 Standing Order for San Jose Division Judges, # 4 Standing Orders for Judges of the Northern District of California)(bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2011)
May 25, 2011 Filing 3 Certificate as to Interested Entities by U.S. Airways, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2011)
May 25, 2011 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by U.S. Airways, Inc.. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2011)
May 25, 2011 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (NO PROCESS) from Superior Court of California, Santa Clara County. Their case number is 111CV196557. (Filing fee $350 receipt number 54611009750). Filed by U.S. Airways, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E (Answer to Unverified Complaint), # 6 Civil Cover Sheet) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wang v. U.S. Airways, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jing Fang Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Airways, Inc.
Represented By: Alisha Amelia Beltramo
Represented By: Richard Grotch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?