Schlumberger Technology Corporation, Inc v. East Charleston, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Schlumberger Technology Corporation, Inc
Defendant: East Charleston, Inc and Pacific American Management Company
Case Number: 5:2011cv02587
Filed: May 27, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:9601
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 285 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice; finding as moot 209 Motion in Limine (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2013)
June 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 281 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 280 Stipulation Mutually Dismissing Great American and ECI/PAMCO's Claims with Prejudice.(lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2013)
June 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 276 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 274 Stipulation Mutually Dismissing STC/NSM, ECI/PAMCO and Great American's Claims Agaisnt Each Other Without Prejudice.(lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2013)
June 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER re: Settlement Status Conference and Good Faith Determination Motion. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on June 20, 2013. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2013)
June 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER re 265 Notice of Settlement filed by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company fka The Aetna Casualty and Surety Company. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on June 19, 2013. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2013)
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER re 256 MOTION for Determination of Good Faith Settlement and for an Order Barring Contribution filed by East Charleston, Inc, Pacific American Management Company. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on June 18, 2013. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2013)
June 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER Granting Request to Extend Time. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on June 11, 2013. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2013)
June 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER Re: Post-Trial Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on June 10, 2013. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2013)
May 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 248 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 247 Stipulation to Extend Time for Filing of Pretrial Statement.(lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2013)
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 192 Motion to Strike ; denying 196 Motion to Strike ; denying 223 Motion (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2013)
April 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 155 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 156 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 161 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2013)
April 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 222 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 220 Stipulation to Withdrawal of Jury Demand and Consent to Nonjury Trial.(lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2013)
April 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 212 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 206 Stipulation to Clarify and Consolidate Case Schedule.(lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2013)
February 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 148 Stipulation (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2013)
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 142 Stipulation (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2013)
January 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 140 Stipulation (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2013)
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 138 Stipulation (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2013)
December 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 132 Motion to Appear by Telephone (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/31/2012)
September 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 108 Stipulation modifying discovery schedule (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2012)
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 94 Stipulation (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2012)
June 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 84 Stipulation (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2012)
May 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 68 Stipulation (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2012)
April 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER re 65 Stipulation, filed by Schlumberger Technology Corporation, Inc, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 4/4/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2012)
March 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/22/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2012)
March 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/14/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2012)
March 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/7/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2012)
February 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Protective ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 2/3/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2012)
December 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER re 35 Proposed Order filed by Schlumberger Technology Corporation, Inc. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/9/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2011)
August 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Approving 7 Stipulation Continuing Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on August 2, 2011. (psglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schlumberger Technology Corporation, Inc v. East Charleston, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Schlumberger Technology Corporation, Inc
Represented By: Laura S. Bernard
Represented By: Tom Joel Boer
Represented By: Richard Craig Coffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Charleston, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific American Management Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?