Fehl v. Manhattan Insurance Group
Plaintiff: Kenneth P. Fehl
Defendant: Manhattan Insurance Group
Case Number: 5:2011cv02688
Filed: June 3, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 72 Stipulation (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2012)
June 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER Case Management Conference set for 7/25/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 6/15/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2012)
May 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER DENYING 60 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Manhattan Life Insurance Company, Manhattan Insurance Group. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 5/2/2012. (psglc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2012)
March 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY re 52 Notice (Other), filed by Manhattan Life Insurance Company, Manhattan Insurance Group. Counsel to contact CourtCall to arrange. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/8/12. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2012)
December 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER re 41 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) filed by Manhattan Life Insurance Company, Manhattan Insurance Group GRANTING REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/22/11. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2011)
August 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS re 26 Case referred to mediation. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 8/23/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fehl v. Manhattan Insurance Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manhattan Insurance Group
Represented By: A. Louis Dorny
Represented By: A. Louis Dorny
Represented By: Ronald K. Alberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth P. Fehl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?