Royal v. City of Hollister et al
Plaintiff: Jennifer Roybal
Defendant: Rudy Rodriguez, Morris, Magnuson, Arny Weathers, Pershall, Carlos Rodriguez, City of Hollister, Hollister Police Department, Jorge Ramirez, Aguillera and Beau Leland
Case Number: 5:2011cv02698
Filed: June 3, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Benito
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING DISMISSAL. The Clerk shall close this file. Motions terminated: 26 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Protective Order filed by Aguillera, Morris, Carlos Rodriguez, Arny Weathers, Pershall, City of Hollister, Rudy Rodriguez, Hollister Police Department, Jorge Ramirez, 29 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Voluntary Dismissal filed by Jennifer Roybal., ***ALL Deadlines terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/7/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2013)
October 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO ALLOW SPECIFIED DISCOVERY AFTER DISCOVERY CUTOFF. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/31/2012. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2012)
October 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Request to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint re 9 Stipulation. Response due 10/18/2011. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/7/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2011)
July 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO TRANSFER MATTER TO SAN JOSE DIVISION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 19, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Royal v. City of Hollister et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rudy Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magnuson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arny Weathers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pershall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Hollister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hollister Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorge Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aguillera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beau Leland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Roybal
Represented By: Charles Frederick Bourdon
Represented By: Ruth Marian Edelstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?