Lopez v. Cash
Plaintiff: |
Darrell Lee Lopez |
Defendant: |
Lewis, Cash and Kamala Harris |
Case Number: |
5:2011cv02736 |
Filed: |
June 7, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of California |
Office: |
San Jose Office |
County: |
Alameda |
Presiding Judge: |
Edward J. Davila |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 4, 2012 |
Filing
24
ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Court granted Plaintiff two additional extensions of time in the interest of justice, with the last order filed on March 19, 2012, granting Plaintiff another thirty days to complete his IFP application, i.e., no later than Apr il 18, 2012. The deadline has since passed, and Plaintiff has neither paid the filing fee nor filed the necessary documents to complete his IFP application. On April 25, 2012, Plaintiff filed a letter indicating that he has failed to acquire the nece ssary document and that he would no longer be filing any matters in this case. Accordingly, this case is DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to pay the filing fee. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/4/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2012)
|
February 2, 2012 |
Filing
18
ORDER GRANTING SECOND EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE COMPLETE IN FORMA PAUPERISAPPLICATION. Plaintiff shall submit the missing document within thirty (30) days of the date this order is filed. Alternatively, Plaintiff may pay the complete filing fee of & #036;350.00 to avoid dismissal of this case. Failure to file the necessary document or to pay the filing fee will result in dismissal of this action for failure to pay the filing fee. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/1/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2012)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?