Hosea v. Wynne
Plaintiff: Nathaniel Hosea
Defendant: Michael B Donley
Case Number: 5:2011cv02892
Filed: June 16, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER granting 111 Motion for Summary Judgment. Since this result essentially resolves this action, judgment will be entered in favor of Defendant. All other matters and all other hearings, including the pretrial conference and trial dates, are TERMINATED and VACATED. The clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/11/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2013)
November 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT RE 130 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL DATES AND DEADLINES filed by Michael B Donley. Expert Discovery due by 12/20/2012. The request to continue the Pretrial Conference and tr ial dates is DENIED. Those dates remain as scheduled. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-1(b), the court finds Defendant's motion for summary judgment (Docket Item No. 111) suitable for decision without oral argument. Accordingly, the motion hearing scheduled for January 18, 2013, is VACATED and the motion submitted for decision. The court will issue a written order based on the pleadings. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/15/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2012)
October 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT 11/27/2012 MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AND FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT HEARING, granting 118 Proposed Order filed by Nathaniel Hosea: Plaintiff is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 10/24/2012. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2012) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/24/2012: # 1 certificate of service) (ofr, COURT STAFF).
July 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 107 PRETRIAL ORDER (JURY TRIAL). Based on the parties' Joint Preliminary Pretrial Conference Statement, the court has determined an appearance is unnecessary at this time. Accordingly, the 7/13/2012 Preliminary Pretrial Conference is VACATED and the parties are ordered to comply with the following schedule: Defendant shall notify Plaintiff by telephone that the Preliminary Pretrial Conference has been vacated and that a full case schedule, including trial dates, have been set. Amended Fact Dis covery cutoff 9/30/2012. Last date for Filing Dispositive Motions due by 11/23/2012. Amended Expert Discovery cutoff 11/15/2012. Final Pretrial Conference statement due by 1/4/2013. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/18/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. Jury Selection set for 2/4/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Jury Trial set for 2/5/2013 - 2/7/2013; 2/11/2013 - 2/12/2013. Jury Deliberations set for 2/13/2013 through 2/15/201 3. The court advises the parties that this is the final case schedule. Both Plaintiff and Defendant are expected to comply as directed above. This schedule will not be amended further absent the presentation of good cause necessitating such an amendment. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/11/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2012) Modified text on 7/11/2012 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
April 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF NATHANIEL S. HOSEA'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT re 84 Request, filed by Nathaniel Hosea. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on April 12, 2012. (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2012)
February 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART PLAINTIFF NATHANIEL S. HOSEA'S MOTION TO COMPEL re 47 Memorandum in Support, filed by Nathaniel Hosea. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on February 10, 2012. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2012)
July 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DIRECTING CLERK'S OFFICE TO CLOSE CASE CV-11-02715-PSG; Certificate of Service. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/1/2011. (sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hosea v. Wynne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathaniel Hosea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael B Donley
Represented By: Claire T. Cormier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?