Microsoft Corporation v. TIVO Inc Featured Case
Plaintiff: Microsoft Corporation
Defendant: TiVo Inc.
Case Number: 5:2011cv02896
Filed: June 16, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2011 Filing 35 Case transferred in from District of Washington Western; Case Number 2:11-cv-00134. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Modified on 6/16/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
May 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting dft's 21 Motion to stay and to transfer venue to Northern District of CA by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
March 22, 2011 Filing 29 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to FRCP 7.1. by TIVO Inc. Filed by Defendant TIVO Inc..(McWilliam, Jofrey)
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting 10 Stipulated Motion re answer to complaint by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
January 24, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Patent Infringement against defendant(s) TIVO Inc. (Receipt # 0981-2310118), filed by Microsoft Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form120), # 7 Summons)(Harrigan, Arthur)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Microsoft Corporation v. TIVO Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TiVo Inc.
Represented By: Morgan Chu
Represented By: Andrei Iancu
Represented By: Bradley S Keller
Represented By: Joseph M Lipner
Represented By: Samuel K Lu
Represented By: Jofrey M McWilliam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Microsoft Corporation
Represented By: Shane P. Cramer
Represented By: T. Andrew Culbert
Represented By: Mark G. Davis
Represented By: Timothy DeMasi
Represented By: Arthur W. Harrigan, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew D Powers
Represented By: Stacy Quan
Represented By: Christopher T Wion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?