Zynga Inc. v. Vostu USA, Inc. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Zynga Inc.
Defendant: Vostu USA, Inc., Vostu LLC and Vostu, Ltd.
Case Number: 5:2011cv02959
Filed: June 16, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2011 Filing 14 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/28/2011. Case Management Conference set for 11/4/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2011)
June 30, 2011 Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd for discovery matters. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2011)
June 30, 2011 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zynga Inc.. Vostu LLC served on 6/16/2011, answer due 7/7/2011; Vostu USA, Inc. served on 6/16/2011, answer due 7/7/2011; Vostu, Ltd. served on 6/24/2011, answer due 7/15/2011. (Wilson, Dennis) (Filed on 6/30/2011)
June 30, 2011 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Zynga Inc. re 1 Complaint PROOF OF SERVICE AS TO VOSTU, LLC (Wilson, Dennis) (Filed on 6/30/2011)
June 30, 2011 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Zynga Inc. re 1 Complaint PROOF OF SERVICE AS TO VOSTU, LTD. (Wilson, Dennis) (Filed on 6/30/2011)
June 30, 2011 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Zynga Inc. re 1 Complaint PROOF OF SERVICE AS TO VOSTU LLC (Wilson, Dennis) (Filed on 6/30/2011)
June 30, 2011 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Zynga Inc. re 1 Complaint PROOF OF SERVICE AS TO VOSTU USA, INC. (Wilson, Dennis) (Filed on 6/30/2011)
June 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/28/11. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2011)
June 27, 2011 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2011)
June 27, 2011 Filing 6 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Zynga Inc. and Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge. (Wilson, Dennis) (Filed on 6/27/2011)
June 16, 2011 Filing 5 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT (cc: form mailed to register). (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
June 16, 2011 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
June 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 9/15/2011. Case Management Conference set for 9/22/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/16/11. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
June 16, 2011 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Zynga Inc. re 1 Complaint (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
June 16, 2011 Filing 2 EXHIBIT 1 to Complaint filed byZynga Inc.. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
June 16, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT /issued summons against Vostu LLC, Vostu USA, Inc., Vostu, Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611061085.). Filed byZynga Inc.. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zynga Inc. v. Vostu USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zynga Inc.
Represented By: David K. Caplan
Represented By: Larry Wayne McFarland
Represented By: Tara D Rose
Represented By: Dennis LeRoy Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vostu USA, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Hugh Blavin
Represented By: Andrew P. Bridges
Represented By: Mark Russell Conrad
Represented By: Jennifer A. Golinveaux
Represented By: Kelly M Klaus
Represented By: Carolyn Hoecker Luedtke
Represented By: Ronald Leroy Olson
Represented By: Carolyn Veronica Zabrycki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vostu LLC
Represented By: Jonathan Hugh Blavin
Represented By: Andrew P. Bridges
Represented By: Mark Russell Conrad
Represented By: Jennifer A. Golinveaux
Represented By: Kelly M Klaus
Represented By: Carolyn Hoecker Luedtke
Represented By: Ronald Leroy Olson
Represented By: Carolyn Veronica Zabrycki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vostu, Ltd.
Represented By: Jonathan Hugh Blavin
Represented By: Andrew P. Bridges
Represented By: Mark Russell Conrad
Represented By: Jennifer A. Golinveaux
Represented By: Kelly M Klaus
Represented By: Carolyn Hoecker Luedtke
Represented By: Ronald Leroy Olson
Represented By: Carolyn Veronica Zabrycki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?