Schulter v. Board of Trustees of the California State University et al
Plaintiff: Martin Schulter
Defendant: Board of Trustees of the California State University and Jason Laker
Case Number: 5:2011cv03094
Filed: June 23, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER GRANTING 90 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/23/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2013)
October 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER GRANTING 41 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE MEDIATION DEADLINE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/22/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2012)
October 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/10/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2012)
August 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING 35 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE ADR COMPLETION DATE TO SEPTEMBER 30, 2012. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/21/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2012)
August 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING: 33 Stipulation to Continue Expert Disclosure and Expert Discovery Cut-off Date. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on August 2, 2012. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
July 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING 31 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DISCOVERY CUT-OFF DATE. Discovery due by 8/10/2012.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/25/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2012) Modified on 7/25/2012 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).
May 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING 29 Stipulation to Continue ADR Completion. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on May 2, 2012. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2012)
February 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/16/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2012)
September 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING 11 Stipulation Early Neutral Evaluation. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 9/29/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schulter v. Board of Trustees of the California State University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Schulter
Represented By: Daniel Mark Siegel
Represented By: Vylma Lourdes Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Trustees of the California State University
Represented By: Cathy L. Arias
Represented By: Raymond A. Greene, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Laker
Represented By: Cathy L. Arias
Represented By: Raymond A. Greene, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?