The American Insurance Company v. Liberty Surplus Insurance Corporation
Plaintiff: The American Insurance Company
Defendant: Liberty Surplus Insurance Corporation
Case Number: 5:2011cv03159
Filed: June 24, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Wm. Terrell Hodges on 11/28/12. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2012)
September 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER setting briefing schedule for additional dispositive motions. By the close of business, 11:59 p.m. PST on Friday, October 26, 2012, all Parties shall, if they so choose, file dispositive motions concerning all outstanding issues and claims, in cluding the duty to defend raised in any third party complaint, cross-claim, or counterclaim, and the allocation of defense costs. Responses in opposition to any such dispositive motions shall be filed by the close of business, 11:59 p.m. PST, on Fr iday, November 9, 2012, and reply briefs shall be filed by the close of business, 11:59 p.m. PST, on Friday, November 16, 2012. The hearing set for November 15, 2012 at 1:30 p.m. is hereby suspended. The Court will reschedule this case for hearing, if necessary and appropriate, by separate order. Signed by Wm. Terrell Hodges, Senior Judge. (wthlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2012)
September 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Case Management Conference set for 9/19/2012 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/4/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2012)
August 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 163 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Wm. Terrell Hodges, Senior Judge granting in part and denying in part 70 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 81 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 85 Motion for Summary Judgment; and denying as moot 130 Motion for Hearing and to File a Position Statement. See Opinion for further details. (wthlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2012)
April 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 155 Stipulation (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2012)
April 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 146 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2012)
March 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER Vacating Motion Hearing, Setting Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/28/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2012)
March 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER Regarding Schedule and Pending Summary Judgment/Adjudication Motions. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/23/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2012)
February 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 63 Motion to Dismiss (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2012)
November 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Regarding Stipulation to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/29/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2011)
November 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY re 28 Notice (Other) filed by The American Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/16/11. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The American Insurance Company v. Liberty Surplus Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The American Insurance Company
Represented By: Keith Allan Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Surplus Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?