Guillem v. Life Insurance Company of America et al
Plaintiff: Cecile Guillem
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of America, Transamerica Life Insurance Company and Alan Kaisler-Meza
Case Number: 5:2011cv03217
Filed: June 29, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Order Granting 27 Stipulation Dismissing Case With Prejudice. The Clerk shall close this file. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 1/31/2013.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2013)
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER (1) TERMINATING 21 MOTION TO COMPEL; AND (2) DIRECTING COMPLIANCE WITH THIS COURT'S STANDING ORDER RE CIVIL DISCOVERY DISPUTES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 3/30/12. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2012)
September 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE pursuant to Federal Rule of Civi1 Procedure 41(a)(l) as to Defendant ALAN KAISLER-MEZA, M.D., ONLY re 18 Stipulation. Alan Kaisler-Meza terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/19/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2011)
August 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER Plaintiff Counsel's Telephonic Appearance for 9/16/2011 CMC re 13 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/26/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2011)
August 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting 10 Notice of Withdrawal re 9 Motion to Remand. Motions terminated: 9 MOTION to Remand back to State Court, and request for fees and costs filed by Cecile Guillem. ***9/23/2011 Hearing and Deadlines terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/12/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guillem v. Life Insurance Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Adrienne Clare Publicover
Represented By: Donald Patrick Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transamerica Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Adrienne Clare Publicover
Represented By: Donald Patrick Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Kaisler-Meza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecile Guillem
Represented By: Lawrence Arthur Mann
Represented By: Ray Francis Bourhis, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?