Gonzales v. Leotti
Petitioner: Artemio Gonzales
Respondent: George Leotti
Case Number: 5:2011cv03235
Filed: June 27, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 JUDGMENT, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 4/7/14. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2014)
February 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER 32 Denying Request for Evidentiary Hearing. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 2/3/14. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2014)
January 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 17 Motion to Withdraw ; Granting 18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Respondent's Answer Filed 1/4/2013 is Deemed Timely. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2013)
November 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FILED IN ERROR. WRONG CASE NUMBERORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 11/22/2011. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2011) Modified on 11/22/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
October 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 JUDGMENT, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/24/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzales v. Leotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: George Leotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Artemio Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?