Perez v. Gordon & Wong Law Group, P.C. et al
Plaintiff: Carlos H Perez
Defendant: Gordon & Wong Law Group, P.C., Amy Louise Gordon, Mitchell Lewis Wong and Andrew Arnold Ford
Case Number: 5:2011cv03323
Filed: July 7, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 39 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2012)
May 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER re 37 Notice of Settlement. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 5/21/12. (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2012)
March 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying 18 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 15 Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2012)
November 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER re 25 Stipulation to Continue the Case Management Conference and Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Strike. Case Management Conference continued to 2/2/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Motion Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses continued to 2/2/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Motion Hearing on Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment remains as set on 2/2/2012 1:30 PM. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/14/11. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2011)
November 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER re 19 Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Mediation. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/3/11. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez v. Gordon & Wong Law Group, P.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos H Perez
Represented By: Fred W. Schwinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gordon & Wong Law Group, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Louise Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell Lewis Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Arnold Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?