Serrato et al v. Monterey County et al
Plaintiff: D. B., I. S., Claudia Serrato, Elizabeth Serrato, Israel Serrato, Julian Serrato, Rita Serrato and Rogelio Serrato
Defendant: Sergeant Joseph Banuelos, Al Martinez, Sheriff Scott Miller, Captain Charles Monarque, Monterey County, Kevin Oakley, Sergeant Randy Ragsac, Sergeant Garrett Sanders and Deputy Mark Sievers
Case Number: 5:2011cv03642
Filed: July 25, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Referring Judge: Ronald M Whyte
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Order by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte granting #59 stipulation to dismiss with prejudice.(rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2013)
October 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Order by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte granting #57 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2013)
October 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Order by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte granting #58 Motion to Appoint Guardian ad Litem and approving Minors' Compromise.(rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2013)
September 27, 2013 Filing 59 STIPULATION and (PROPOSED) ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE filed by Julian Serrato, Rogelio Serrato, Israel Serrato. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D - Settlement Terms)(Altomare, Gina) (Filed on 9/27/2013) Modified on 9/27/2013 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
September 17, 2013 Filing 58 Amended Petition Appointing Guardian ad Litem and Approving Minors' Compromise and (Proposed) Order filed by D. B., I. S., Claudia Serrato, Elizabeth Serrato, Rita Serrato. (Nisenbaum, Benjamin) (Filed on 9/17/2013) Text modified on 9/18/2013 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
September 17, 2013 Filing 57 Administrative Motion and (Proposed) Order to to File Under Seal filed by D. B., I. S., Claudia Serrato, Elizabeth Serrato, Rita Serrato. (Nisenbaum, Benjamin) (Filed on 9/17/2013) Text modified on 9/18/2013 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
July 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting #52 Motion to Approve Minors' Compromise. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2013)
July 1, 2013 Filing 55 (PROPOSED) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS ROGELIO SERRATOS, JULIAN SERRATOS, AND ISRAEL SERRATOS UNOPPOSED MOTION TO APPROVE MINORS COMPROMISE re #52 by Julian Serrato, Rogelio Serrato, Israel Serrato. (Sherwin, Julia) (Filed on 7/1/2013) Modified on 7/15/2013 (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 1, 2013 Filing 54 DECLARATION OF JULIA SHERWIN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS ROGELIO SERRATOS, JULIAN SERRATOS, AND ISRAEL SERRATOS UNOPPOSED MOTION TO APPROVE MINORS COMPROMISE re #52 filed by Julian Serrato, Rogelio Serrato, Israel Serrato. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Julian Serrato Structured Settlement, #2 Exhibit B, Israel Serrato Structured Settlement, #3 Exhibit C, Qualified Assignment, #4 Exhibit D, Settlement Terms) (Sherwin, Julia) (Filed on 7/1/2013) Modified on 7/15/2013 (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 1, 2013 Filing 53 DECLARATION OF LISA MAGDALENO IN SUPPORT O PLAINTIFFS ROGELIO SERRATO'S, JULIAN SERRATO'S, AND ISRAEL SERRATO'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO APPROVE MINORS' COMPROMISE re #52 filed by Julian Serrato, Rogelio Serrato, Israel Serrato. (Sherwin, Julia) (Filed on 7/1/2013) Modified on 7/15/2013 (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 1, 2013 Filing 52 UNOPPOSED MOTION TO APPROVE MINORS COMPROMISE filed by Julian Serrato, Rogelio Serrato, Israel Serrato. Responses due by 7/15/2013. Replies due by 7/22/2013. (Sherwin, Julia) (Filed on 7/1/2013) Modified on 7/15/2013 (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT - STIPULATION AND ORDER #50 to Vacate Pretrial Conference and Trial Dates: Plaintiff to File Motions to Approve the Minor Plaintiff's Settlement by 9/6/2013 or Appear for a Case Management Conference Re: Settlement on 9/20/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 6/27/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2013)
June 25, 2013 Filing 50 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT, STIPULATION TO VACATE PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES, AND (PROPOSED) ORDER filed by Julian Serrato, Rogelio Serrato, Israel Serrato. (Altomare, Gina) (Filed on 6/25/2013) Modified on 7/15/2013 (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 25, 2013 Filing 49 TRIAL BRIEF by Julian Serrato, Rogelio Serrato, Israel Serrato. (Sherwin, Julia) (Filed on 6/25/2013)
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER #47 Re: Stipulation for Very Brief Extention to Submit Opposing Trial Documents. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 6/25/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2013)
June 10, 2013 Filing 47 STIPULATION FOR VERY BRIEF EXTENSION TO SUBMIT OPPOSING TRIAL DOCUMENTS w/DECLARATION OF BRUCE D. PRAET and [PROPOSED ORDER] filed by Monterey County. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Praet, Bruce) (Filed on 6/10/2013) Modified on 7/15/2013 (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 6, 2013 Filing 46 NOTICE of Unavailability of Defense Counsel from June 17, 2013, through July 2, 2013 by Joseph Banuelos, Al Martinez, Scott Miller, Charles Monarque, Monterey County, Kevin Oakley, Randy Ragsac, Garrett Sanders, Mark Sievers (Praet, Bruce) (Filed on 6/6/2013) Modified on 6/6/2013 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
March 19, 2013 Filing 45 Notice of Unavailability of Plaintiff's Counsel from May 1, 2013 through May 12, 2013 and May 16, 2013 through May 20, 2013 by Julian Serrato, Rogelio Serrato, Israel Serrato (Sherwin, Julia) (Filed on 3/19/2013) Text modified on 3/20/2013 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
February 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 AMENDED STIPULATION AND ORDER #41 to Amend Case Management Order: Jury Trial set for 7/22/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Pretrial Conference set for 7/11/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. *The parties are to have a Settlement Conference with the assigned magistrate judge prior to the pretrial conference date. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 2/27/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2013)
February 22, 2013 Filing 43 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 2/22/2013 before Ronald M. Whyte (Date Filed: 2/22/2013) re (23 in 5:11-cv-03642-RMW) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Julian Serrato, Israel Serrato, Rogelio Serrato. (Court Reporter Summer Fisher.) (jg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/22/2013)
February 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Order by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte denying (23) (32) Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment in case 5:11-cv-03642-RMW. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2013)
February 19, 2013 Filing 41 Amended Stipulation and (PROPOSED) to Amend Case Management Order filed by Julian Serrato, Rogelio Serrato, Israel Serrato. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael J. Haddad, #2 Declaration of Benjamin Nisenbaum) (Altomare, Gina) (Filed on 2/19/2013) Modified on 2/21/2013 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
February 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER by Judge Whyte not accepting #29 Stipulation to amend case management order. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2013)
February 8, 2013 Filing 39 REPLY BRIEF TO DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re #23 filed by Rita Serrato. (Burris, John) (Filed on 2/8/2013) Modified on 2/11/2013 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
February 8, 2013 Filing 38 Declaration of Gina Altomare in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re #23 filed by Julian Serrato, Rogelio Serrato, Israel Serrato. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit-O: Williams Dep, #2 Exhibit-P: Safariland Manual Excerpt, #3 Exhibit-Q: Magdaleno Dep Excerpt) (Altomare, Gina) (Filed on 2/8/2013) Modified on 2/11/2013 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
February 8, 2013 Filing 37 REPLY TO DEFENDANTS RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT (re #23 filed by Julian Serrato, Rogelio Serrato, Israel Serrato. (Altomare, Gina) (Filed on 2/8/2013) Modified on 2/11/2013 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
February 6, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #23 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . Motion Hearing set for 2/15/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2013)
January 31, 2013 Filing 36 REPLY to Plaintiffs' Objections to Timeliness of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment re #23 filed by Joseph Banuelos, Al Martinez, Scott Miller, Charles Monarque, Monterey County, Kevin Oakley, Randy Ragsac, Garrett Sanders, Mark Sievers. (Praet, Bruce) (Filed on 1/31/2013) Modified on 1/31/2013 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
January 30, 2013 Filing 35 NOTICE OF JOINDER IN PLAINTIFFS ROGELIO SERRATO, ET AL, OBJECTION TO DEFENDANTS CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND ADDENDUM REGARDING DISPUTED FACTS by Rita Serrato et al (Burris, John) (Filed on 1/30/2013) Modified on 1/31/2013 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
January 30, 2013 Filing 34 OBJECTIONS to Defendants' Untimely and Improper Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Addendum Re: Disputed Facts and (Proposed) Order by Julian Serrato, Rogelio Serrato, Israel Serrato. (Altomare, Gina) (Filed on 1/30/2013)
January 30, 2013 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel Genevieve Kathryn Guertin filed by Plaintiffs (Guertin, Genevieve) (Filed on 1/30/2013) Modified on 1/30/2013 (bw, COURT STAFF).
January 30, 2013 Filing 32 OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT and CROSSMOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re #32 filed by Joseph Banuelos, Al Martinez, Scott Miller, Charles Monarque, Monterey County, Kevin Oakley, Randy Ragsac, Garrett Sanders, Mark Sievers. (Attachments: #1 Addendum re Disputed Facts, #2 Declaration of Bruce D. Praet, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Notice of Lodging Depositions, #16 (Proposed) Order) (Praet, Bruce) (Filed on 1/30/2013) Modified on 1/30/2013 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
January 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION AND ORDER #28 Setting Briefing and Hearing Schedule for Plaintiff's Motion for partial Summary Judgment. Set/Reset Deadlines as to #23 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . Motion Hearing set for 2/22/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/29/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2013)
January 28, 2013 Filing 30 Declaration of Gina Altomare in Support of Stipulation and (Proposed) Order to Amend Case Management Order re #29 filed by Julian Serrato, Rogelio Serrato, Israel Serrato. (Altomare, Gina) (Filed on 1/28/2013) Modified on 1/28/2013 (bw, COURT STAFF).
January 28, 2013 Filing 29 STIPULATION and (PROPOSED) ORDER to Amend Case Management Order filed by Julian Serrato, Rogelio Serrato, Israel Serrato. (Altomare, Gina) (Filed on 1/28/2013) Modified on 1/28/2013 (bw, COURT STAFF).
January 22, 2013 Filing 28 STIPULATION and (PROPOSED) ORDER Setting Briefing and Hearing Schedule for Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re #23 filed by Julian Serrato, Rogelio Serrato, Israel Serrato. (Altomare, Gina) (Filed on 1/22/2013) Modified on 1/23/2013 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
January 11, 2013 Filing 27 Notice of Joinder In Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re #24 Declaration in Support #26 Proposed Order, #23 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , #25 Declaration in Support Plaintiffs' Rita Serrato, et al. Notice of Joinder in Plaintiffs' Rogelio Serrato, et al. Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by D. B., I. S., Elizabeth Serrato, Rita Serrato. (Nisenbaum, Benjamin) (Filed on 1/11/2013) Modified on 1/11/2013 (bw, COURT STAFF).
January 11, 2013 Filing 26 (Proposed) Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re #23 by Julian Serrato, Rogelio Serrato, Israel Serrato. (Altomare, Gina) (Filed on 1/11/2013) Modified on 1/11/2013 (bw, COURT STAFF).
January 11, 2013 Filing 25 Declaration of James Desmarais re 923 filed by Julian Serrato, Rogelio Serrato, Israel Serrato. (Altomare, Gina) (Filed on 1/11/2013) Modified on 1/11/2013 (bw, COURT STAFF).
January 11, 2013 Filing 24 DECLARATION OF GINA ALTOMARE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT re #23 filed by Julian Serrato, Rogelio Serrato, Israel Serrato. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Clark Deposition, #2 Exhibit B - Banuelos Deposition, #3 Exhibit C - Ragsac Deposition, #4 Exhibit D - Miller Deposition, #5 Exhibit E - Monarque Deposition, #6 Exhibit F - Oakley Deposition, #7 Exhibit G - Sanders Deposition, #8 Exhibit H - Martinez Deposition, #9 Exhibit I - Sievers Deposition, #10 Exhibit J - Safariland Manual Excerpt, #11 Exhibit K - Scene Photos, #12 Exhibit L - Supplemental Report No. 4, #13 Exhibit M - Coroner's Report, #14 Exhibit N - Cal Fire Investigation Report) (Altomare, Gina) (Filed on 1/11/2013) Modified on 1/11/2013 (bw, COURT STAFF).
January 11, 2013 Filing 23 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT filed by Julian Serrato, Rogelio Serrato, Israel Serrato. Motion Hearing set for 2/15/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Responses due by 1/25/2013. Replies due by 2/1/2013. (Altomare, Gina) (Filed on 1/11/2013) Modified on 1/11/2013 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
December 20, 2012 Filing 22 Notice of Unavailability of Plaintiffs' Counsel from December 24, 2013 through January 11, 2013 by Julian Serrato, Rogelio Serrato, Israel Serrato (Sherwin, Julia) (Filed on 12/20/2012) Modified on 12/21/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 10, 2012 Filing 21 NOTICE of Unavailability of Plaintiffs' Counsel from September 17, 2012 through October 1,2012 by Julian Serrato, Rogelio Serrato, Israel Serrato (Sherwin, Julia) (Filed on 9/10/2012) Modified on 9/11/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
June 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER #19 to Extend Deadline for Participation in Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 6/20/12. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2012)
April 16, 2012 Filing 19 STIPULATION AND REQUEST TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR PARTICIPATION IN SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Monterey County. (Attachments: #1 (Proposed) Order)(Praet, Bruce) (Filed on 4/16/2012) Modified on 4/16/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
January 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ERRATA-CORRECTED CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER #16 : Discovery cutoff 1/25/2013. Jury Trial set for 4/15/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Motion Hearing set for 2/15/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Pretrial Conference set for 4/4/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/10/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2012)
December 12, 2011 Filing 16 Proposed Scheduling Order re #15 by Monterey County. (Praet, Bruce) (Filed on 12/12/2011) Modified on 12/13/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
December 9, 2011 Filing 17 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 12/9/2011 before Ronald M. Whyte (Date Filed: 12/9/2011). Jury Trial set for 4/15/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Motion Hearing set for 2/15/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Pretrial Conference set for 4/4/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Discovery cutoff 1/25/2013. Early Settlement Conference with Magistrate Judge Grewal before the end of April 2012. (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (jg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/9/2011)
December 9, 2011 Filing 15 (Proposed) Scheduling Order by Monterey County. (Praet, Bruce) (Filed on 12/9/2011) Modified on 12/15/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
December 1, 2011 Filing 14 NOTICE of Unavailability of Counsel by Julian Serrato, Rogelio Serrato, Israel Serrato (Altomare, Gina) (Filed on 12/1/2011) Modified on 12/2/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 28, 2011 Filing 13 Notice Unavailability of Counsel by Joseph Banuelos, Al Martinez, Scott Miller, Charles Monarque, Monterey County, Kevin Oakley, Randy Ragsac (Grant, Irven) (Filed on 11/28/2011) Modified on 11/28/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 17, 2011 Filing 12 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT [in this and in related case no. C-11-4106] filed by Julian Serrato, Rogelio Serrato, Israel Serrato. (Haddad, Michael) (Filed on 11/17/2011) Modified on 11/18/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 20, 2011 Filing 11 CLERKS NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Conference set for 12/9/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/2/2011. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2011)
October 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RELATING CASE to C-11-04106. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/20/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2011)
October 11, 2011 Filing 9 Notice and Administrative Motion to Determine Whether Cases Should be Related and (Proposed) Order (CIVIL L.R. 3-12) (re CV4106PSG) filed by Rita Serrato, Elizabeth Serrato, Claudia Serrato, I. S., D. B. (Burris, John) (Filed on 10/11/2011) Modified on 10/12/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2011 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint re #1 with Jury Demand by Joseph Banuelos, Al Martinez, Scott Miller, Charles Monarque, Monterey County, Kevin Oakley, Randy Ragsac, Garrett Sanders, Mark Sievers. (Praet, Bruce) (Filed on 10/3/2011) Modified on 10/4/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 28, 2011 Filing 7 CLERKS NOTICE OF SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Conference set for 10/21/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/14/2011. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2011)
July 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Ronald M. Whyte for all further proceedings and Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal for all discovery matters. Signed by The Executive Committee on 7/28/2011. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2011)
July 26, 2011 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge: 10/11/2011 Case Management Conference is hereby vacated. Clerk to reassign case. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2011)
July 26, 2011 Filing 4 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge and Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge by Julian Serrato, Rogelio Serrato, Israel Serrato. (Altomare, Gina) (Filed on 7/26/2011) Modified on 7/26/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 26, 2011 ***Deadlines terminated. #5 TERMINATING 10/11/2011 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2011)
July 25, 2011 Filing 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 10/4/2011. Case Management Conference set for 10/11/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2011) (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 25, 2011 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Joseph Banuelos, Al Martinez, Scott Miller, Charles Monarque, Monterey County, Kevin Oakley, Randy Ragsac, Garrett Sanders, Mark Sievers. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2011) (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 25, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages, Declaratory, and Injunctive Relief, (Summons Issued); jury demand; against Mark Sievers, Joseph Banuelos, Al Martinez, Scott Miller, Charles Monarque, Monterey County, Kevin Oakley, Randy Ragsac, Garrett Sanders ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 44611007336). Filed by Israel Serrato, Rogelio Serrato, Julian Serrato. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/26/2011: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 25, 2011 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Serrato et al v. Monterey County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. B.
Represented By: Benjamin Nisenbaum
Represented By: John L. Burris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: I. S.
Represented By: Benjamin Nisenbaum
Represented By: John L. Burris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia Serrato
Represented By: Benjamin Nisenbaum
Represented By: John L. Burris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Serrato
Represented By: Benjamin Nisenbaum
Represented By: John L. Burris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Israel Serrato
Represented By: Gina N. Altomare
Represented By: Genevieve Kathryn Guertin
Represented By: Michael J. Haddad
Represented By: Julia Sherwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julian Serrato
Represented By: Gina N. Altomare
Represented By: Genevieve Kathryn Guertin
Represented By: Michael J. Haddad
Represented By: Julia Sherwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita Serrato
Represented By: Benjamin Nisenbaum
Represented By: John L. Burris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rogelio Serrato
Represented By: Gina N. Altomare
Represented By: Genevieve Kathryn Guertin
Represented By: Michael J. Haddad
Represented By: Julia Sherwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Joseph Banuelos
Represented By: Irven L. Grant
Represented By: Bruce Daniel Praet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Al Martinez
Represented By: Irven L. Grant
Represented By: Bruce Daniel Praet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Scott Miller
Represented By: Irven L. Grant
Represented By: Bruce Daniel Praet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Charles Monarque
Represented By: Irven L. Grant
Represented By: Bruce Daniel Praet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monterey County
Represented By: Irven L. Grant
Represented By: Bruce Daniel Praet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Oakley
Represented By: Irven L. Grant
Represented By: Bruce Daniel Praet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Randy Ragsac
Represented By: Irven L. Grant
Represented By: Bruce Daniel Praet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Garrett Sanders
Represented By: Bruce Daniel Praet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Mark Sievers
Represented By: Bruce Daniel Praet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?