Zertuche v. County of Santa Clara et al
Plaintiff: Hosetta Zertuche
Defendant: Kimberly Maruffi, County of Santa Clara, James Gleason and Sandra Eovino
Case Number: 5:2011cv03691
Filed: July 27, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 149 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2013)
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 134 DISREGARD ENTRY. ORDER APPLIES TO ANOTHER CASE. SCHEDULING AND PRETRIAL ORDER, Case referred to ADR for Court mediation to be completed by 1/17/14. Amended Pleadings due by 11/18/2013. Case Management Statement due by 3/3/2014. N On-Expert Discovery due by 2/28/2014. Joinder of Parties due by 11/18/2013. Case Management Conference set for 3/10/2014 02:00 PM. Final Pretrial Conference set for Friday, 4/25/2014 09:00 PM. Jury Selection set for 5/12/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroo m 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. 2 Day Jury Trial set for 5/12/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Dispositive Motions Hearing set for 3/25/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4t h Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Compliance Hearing is set for Friday, 4/11/2014 09:01 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/13/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2013) Modified on 11/13/2013 (fs, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/13/2013 (fs, COURT STAFF).
November 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 124 PRETRIAL ORDER No. 2 Re Defendant's Motions in Limine No. 1-9 by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting in part and denying in part 89 Motion in Limine; denying 90 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 91 Motion in Li mine; granting in part and denying in part 92 Motion in Limine; granting 93 Motion in Limine; granting 94 Motion in Limine; granting 95 Motion in Limine; granting 96 Motion in Limine; denying 113 Motion in Limine (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2013)
November 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER RE:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/5/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2013)
October 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 85 Motion for Leave to File (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2013)
August 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 64 Motion for Extension of Time for Expert Disclosure. Telephone Conference set for Monday, 8/26/2013 at 1:30pm and will be held via CourtCall. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2013)
August 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER vacating 8/13/13 hearing re 64 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Hosetta Zertuche. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/6/13. (kk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2013)
June 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:FAILURE TO FILE TIMELY JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 6/17/2013 02:00 PM. Show Cause Response due by 6/10/2013. The Case Management Conference set for Wednesday, 6/5/2013 is CONTINUED to Monday, June 17, 2013 at 2:00pm. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/3/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2013)
April 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting in part and denying in part 19 Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court sets this matter for a case management conference on Monday, May 13, 2013 at 2:00pm. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2013)
October 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Case Management Conference set for 1/14/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/30/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2012)
September 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER VACATING HEARING AND DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 26 Order to Show Cause. The Court VACATES the 9/21/2012 at 9:01am hearing on the Order to Show Cause. No sanctions are ordered. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/20/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2012)
September 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH REQUIREMENT TO SUBMIT JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT CONSISTENT WITH FRCP 26(F),LOCAL RULES AND STANDING ORDER. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for Friday, 9/21/2012 09:01 AM. Show Cause Response due by 9/14/2012. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/10/12 is VACATED and RESET for Monday, 11/5/2012 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/5/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2012)
August 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER OF RECUSAL. The Preliminary Pretrial Conference scheduled for 8/10/2012 is VACATED. All other deadlines contained in 13 the Case Management Order shall remain as currently scheduled unless and until modified by the newly-assigned judge. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/3/2012. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zertuche v. County of Santa Clara et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Maruffi
Represented By: Robert M. Coelho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Santa Clara
Represented By: Robert M. Coelho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Gleason
Represented By: Robert M. Coelho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Eovino
Represented By: Robert M. Coelho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hosetta Zertuche
Represented By: Michael Edward Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?