Hughes et al v. Los Gatos Union School District et al
Plaintiff: Ryan Fitzgerald Hughes and Richard F Hughes
Defendant: Los Gatos Union School District, Los Gatos-Saratoga Recreation, Lisa Fraser, Lisa Nanez, Curtis Summers and Dan Racimo
Case Number: 5:2011cv03729
Filed: July 29, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER by Judge Lucy Koh granting 61 Motion for Summary Judgment. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2014)
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER TO FILE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 1/2/2014. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2014)
June 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER; ORDER DENYING AS MOOT 50 STIPULATION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY AND PRETRIAL CONFERENCE DATES.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2013)
March 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 45 Stipulation Protective Order.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2013)
September 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting in part and denying in part the Defendants' Motion to Dismiss re 29 Order on Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Wm. Terrell Hodges, Senior District Judge. (wthlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2012)
September 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER re 31 Order Vacating Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/4/2012. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2012)
September 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/10/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2012)
September 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 30 . (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hughes et al v. Los Gatos Union School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Fitzgerald Hughes
Represented By: Charles A. Bonner
Represented By: Adam Cabral Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard F Hughes
Represented By: Adam Cabral Bonner
Represented By: Charles A. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Los Gatos Union School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Los Gatos-Saratoga Recreation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Fraser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Nanez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Summers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Racimo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?