Jethro Magat v. Apple Inc et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Jethro Magat
Defendant: Apple Inc and Does
Case Number: 5:2011cv03757
Filed: August 3, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2011 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 8:11-cv-00938. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 2, 2011 Filing 5 MDL Transmittal Letter. (rrp)
August 2, 2011 Filing 4 Transfer Out MDL Case Transmittal Letter. Electronic file, conditional transfer order and the docket sheet sent to USDC, Northern District of California on 8/2/2011. (rrp)
August 2, 2011 Filing 3 TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2188, that the action is transferred to USDC, Northern District of California and, with the consent of that court, assigned to Judge Ronald M. Whyte for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Electronic file, conditional transfer order and docket sheet sent. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (Attachments: # 1 CV-117) (rrp)
June 29, 2011 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 as to defendant Apple Inc. (twdb)
June 23, 2011 Filing 2 CERTIFICATION of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jethro Magat (ade) (ade).
June 23, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendant Apple Inc. Case assigned to Judge David O. Carter for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Robert N. Block.(Filing fee PAID $ 350) Jury Demanded. Filed by plaintiff Jethro Magat.(ade) (twdb). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/6/2011: # 1 1) (ade).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jethro Magat v. Apple Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jethro Magat
Represented By: Allen B Felahy
Represented By: Oscar Ramirez
Represented By: Boris Sorsher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?