Chevez v. Spencer
Petitioner: James D. Chavez
Respondent: Warden and Spencer
Case Number: 5:2011cv03919
Filed: August 10, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Del Norte
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Presiding Judge: PSLC HHL
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 JUDGMENT. For the reasons stated in the order granting Respondent's motion to dismiss, the case is DISMISSED. Judgment is entered accordingly. The Clerk shall close the file. ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/20/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2012)
March 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The Clerk shall serve by certified mail a copy of this order and the petition and all attachments thereto on Respondent and Respondent's attorney, the Attorney General of the State of California. The Clerk also shall serve a copy of this order on Petitioner. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/22/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2012)
February 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER VACATING JUDGMENT AND REOPENING CASE. On October 17, 2011, the Clerk received the filing fee with a letter dated September 1, 2011. (Docket No. 5 .) Accordingly, the Judgment entered on October 14, 2011, (Docket No. 4 ) is VACATED. The Court will conduct an initial review of the petition in a separate order. The Clerk shall reopen the file. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/13/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2012)
October 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Accordingly, this case is DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to pay the filing fee. The Clerk shall terminate any pending motions and close the file. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/13/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chevez v. Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James D. Chavez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?