Smith et al v. City of Santa Clara et al
Plaintiff: Josephine Smith and A.S.
Defendant: City of Santa Clara, City of Santa Clara Police Department, Henderson and Hill
Case Number: 5:2011cv03999
Filed: August 15, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 283 Response to Note No. 2. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/18/2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2013)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 274 REVISED VERDICT FORM. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 12/17/2013. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 268 DRAFT FINAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 12/16/2013. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2013)
December 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 233 FINAL VERSION OF PRELIMINARY JURY INSTRUCTIONS TO BE READ TO THE JURY. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 12/6/2013. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2013)
December 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 230 PRELIMINARY JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 12/5/203. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2013)
December 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER granting stipulation. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 12/4/2013. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2013)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER granting request to bring in equipment. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 12/2/2013. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2013)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER to submit email. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 11/27/2013. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2013)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER to file motion in limine and opposition by certain dates. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 11/25/2013. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2013)
November 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER re clarification. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 11/4/2013. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2013)
October 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER by Judge Lucy Koh denying 182 Motion for Settlement; denying 184 Motion to Shorten Time (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2013)
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 157 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 150 Stipulation to File Second Amended Complaint.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2013)
February 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 149 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh denying 148 Stipulation to Vacate and Reset Trial Date.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2013)
February 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 140 Stipulation (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2013)
January 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 54 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 64 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2013)
January 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER GRANTING re 88 Letter filed by City of Santa Clara, Henderson, City of Santa Clara Police Department, Hill to Have Attorney Jon Haeberlin Attend and Represent Defendants City of Santa Clara, Detective Kenneth Henderson and Sgt. Greg Hill at the Jan. 30, 2013 Settlement Conference.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/10/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2013)
December 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/5/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2012)
October 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying 50 Stipulation (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2012)
September 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying 48 Stipulation (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2012)
June 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 40 Stipulation (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2012)
April 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR LEAVE TO DEPOSE PRISONER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 4/4/12. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2012)
April 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Directing Parties to File Joint Case Management Statement. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 4/2/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2012)
March 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING re 32 Letter Request of Defendant Detective Kenneth Henderson to be Excused From Personal Attendance at the March 5, 2012 Early Settlement Conference filed by Henderson. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/2/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2012)
February 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF THE PARTIES TO EXTEND TIME FOR EXCHANGING AND LODGING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE BRIEFS. Settlement conference statments extended from 2/20/12 to 2/29/12. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/23/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith et al v. City of Santa Clara et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josephine Smith
Represented By: Brandon Clark Rose
Represented By: James McManis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.S.
Represented By: Brandon Clark Rose
Represented By: James McManis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Santa Clara
Represented By: Michael C. Serverian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Santa Clara Police Department
Represented By: Michael C. Serverian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henderson
Represented By: Michael C. Serverian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hill
Represented By: Michael C. Serverian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?