Feske et al v. MHC Thousand Trails Limited Partnership et al
Plaintiff: David Feske and Teri Feske
Defendant: MHC Thousand Trails Limited Partnership, MHC Operating Limited Partnership, Equity Lifestyle Properties, Inc and Thousand Trails Management Services, Inc
Case Number: 5:2011cv04124
Filed: August 22, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Cruz
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO CONTINUE CMC. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on July 31, 2013. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2013)
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER DENYING CLASS CERTIFICATION, DENYING LEAVE TO AMEND, AND RE DISCOVERY MOTIONS by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 52 Motion for Protective Order; denying 54 Motion for Clarification; denying 55 Motion to Resolve Sample Size Issues; denying 56 Motion to Resolve Sample Size Issues; denying-without-prejudice 64 Motion to Compel; granting 75 Motion to Deny Class Certification; denying 77 Motion for Leave to File; denying 88 Motion to Certify Class (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2013)
April 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART PLAINTIFFS DAVID FESKE AND TERI FESKE'S MOTION TO COMPEL by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting in part 43 Motion to Compel (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2012)
February 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING THE FEBRUARY 28, 2012 HEARING DATE ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY re 44 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUINGTHE FEBRUARY 28, 2012 HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY filed by MHC Operating Limited Partnership, MHC Thousand Trails Limited Partnership, Thousand Trails Management Services, Inc. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on February 7, 2012. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2012)
January 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO BIFURCATE DISCOVERY by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 33 Motion to Bifurcate (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2012)
December 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DECEMBER 20, 2011 HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO BIFURCATE DISCOVERY AND FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on December 7, 2011. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2011)
November 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on November 16, 2011. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2011)
October 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 AMENDED STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS re 27 Stipulation filed by Teri Feske, David Feske. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on October 13, 2011. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2011)
September 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 9 Stipulation filed by MHC Operating Limited Partnership, MHC Thousand Trails Limited Partnership, Thousand Trails Management Services, Inc. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on September 1, 2011. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Feske et al v. MHC Thousand Trails Limited Partnership et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MHC Thousand Trails Limited Partnership
Represented By: David J. Bradford
Represented By: Michael T. Brody
Represented By: Jean M Doherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MHC Operating Limited Partnership
Represented By: David J. Bradford
Represented By: Michael T. Brody
Represented By: Jean M Doherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equity Lifestyle Properties, Inc
Represented By: David J. Bradford
Represented By: Michael T. Brody
Represented By: Jean M Doherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thousand Trails Management Services, Inc
Represented By: David J. Bradford
Represented By: Michael T. Brody
Represented By: Jean M Doherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Feske
Represented By: Alexander Russell Wheeler
Represented By: Kitty Kit Yee Szeto
Represented By: Kevin I. Shenkman
Represented By: R. Rex Parris
Represented By: Mary Ruth Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teri Feske
Represented By: Mary Ruth Hughes
Represented By: R. Rex Parris
Represented By: Kevin I. Shenkman
Represented By: Kitty Kit Yee Szeto
Represented By: Alexander Russell Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?