Injazat Technology Fund B.S.C. v. Najafi et al
Plaintiff: Injazat Technology Fund B.S.C.
Defendant: Hamid Najafi and Michael Cummiskey
Case Number: 5:2011cv04133
Filed: August 23, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER (1) VACATING CONFIRMATION OF ARBITRATION AWARD; (2) REASSIGNING THE CASE TO A DISTRICT JUDGE; AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Petition. Because not all parties have consented to the undersigned's jurisdiction, the court cannot prov ide the dispositive relief sought. Accordingly, the court VACATES the order confirming the arbitration award as improvidently granted, and ORDERS the Clerk to reassign this case to a district judge. The March 20 hearings are VACATED. Parties may re-notice them before the to-be-assigned district judge. Objections due by 3/23/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 3/9/12. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2012)
February 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd denying 39 Ex Parte Application For Order Shortening Time. The request for entry of judgment as well as defendant's request for a stay shall be heard on March 20, 2012 at 10:00 a.m.(hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2012)
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY ON BEHALF OF INZAJAT TECHNOLOGY FUND B.S.C. 21 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 1/23/12. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2012)
January 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 1/20/12. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Injazat Technology Fund B.S.C. v. Najafi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamid Najafi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Cummiskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Injazat Technology Fund B.S.C.
Represented By: Maya C Dharwarkar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?