Tessera, Inc. v. Sony Corporation
Plaintiff: Tessera, Inc.
Defendant: Sony Corporation
Case Number: 5:2011cv04399
Filed: September 2, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 407 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SETTLEMENT. Stipulated Dismissal or Joint Statement due by 11/15/2013. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 11/22/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. All other pretrial deadlines an d hearing dates are VACATED and any pending motions are TERMINATED. Failure to comply with any part of this Order will be deemed sufficient grounds to dismissthe action. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/28/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2013)
October 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 388 THIRD ORDER RE: MOTIONS IN LIMINE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/22/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2013)
October 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 374 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd GRANTING IN PART 205 MOTION for Sanctions; DENYING 215 MOTION to Strike; and GRANTING 323 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2013)
August 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER REFERRING MATTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Plaintiff Tessera, Inc.'s Motion for Sanctions 207 as well as the Motion to Shorten Time 206 are hereby REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd for resolution. Plaintiff shall re-notice the Motion accordingly. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/7/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2013)
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 179 PRETRIAL ORDER (Jury Trial) Based on the parties Joint Preliminary Pretrial Conference Statement (see Docket Item No. 158) and the discussions held at the conference, the following schedule shall apply to this case: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the part ies are referred to private ADR. Within 10 days of the date this Order is filed, the parties shall file stipulation and proposed order identifying a private mediator. If the parties are unable to agree, they shall submit a joint letter to the court w ithin the same timeframe with the names of two private mediators - one proposed by Plaintiff and one proposed by defendant. The court will then issue an order designating the mediator. The deadline for completion of private ADR is 90 days from the da te of the order identifying the private mediator.. Expert Discovery cutoff 4/30/2013. Joint Interim Status Conference Statement due by 7/19/2013. Status Conference set for 7/26/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. D avila. Joint Final Pretrial Conference Statement due by 9/13/2013. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/27/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. Jury Selection set for 10/28/2013 09:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 10/29/2013, 10/30/2013, 10/31/ 2013, 11/4/2013, 11/5/2013, 11/6/2013, 11/7/2013 before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Jury Deliberations set for 11/8/2013 before Hon. Edward J. Davila. The court advises the parties that this is the final case schedule. All parties are expected to comply as directed above. This schedule will not be amended further absent the presentation of good cause necessitating such an amendment. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/22/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2013)
January 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER denying 82 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answer and Counterclaims. An amended scheduling order resetting the deadlines for expert discovery shall issue in short order. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/7/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2013)
November 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER GRANTING Request to Vacate Expert Report And Discovery Cut-Off Dates And To Reset Dates At December 14,2012 Status Conference re 125 Stipulation filed by Tessera, Inc. ***1/9/2013 Deadlines terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/30/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2012)
November 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER denying 95 Motion for Relief from Non-Dispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge. The court schedules this case for a Status Conference on 12/14/2012 at 10:00 a.m. On or before 12/7/2012, the parties shall file Joint Status Conference Statement which describes the parties' agreement in connection with the discovery at issue, or if one has not been reached, describes the parties' respective positions on the issue. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/26/2012. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2012)
November 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER RE: MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NON-DISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER. Plaintiff shall file its written opposition to 95 Defendant's Motion for Relief from Non-Dispositive Pretrial Order, if any, on or before 11/16/2012. No reply brief shall be filed or considered. The Motion will then be deemed submitted for decision and the court will issue an order based on the pleadings. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/9/2012. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2012)
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 113 DISCOVERY ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd allocating 107 deposition time. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2012)
November 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER REFERRING MOTION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOWARD R. LLOYD. Defendant Sony Corporations 107 Motion to Enforce as well as the 108 Motion to Shorten Time, both of which are discovery-related matters, are hereby REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd for resolution. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/2/2012. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2012)
October 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd denying 89 Motion for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2012)
October 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 99 Order Granting 94 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 10/26/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2012)
October 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 77 Discovery Dispute Joint Report #4. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2012)
October 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 79 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING 75 Stipulation TO TAKE THIRD PARTY DEPOSITIONS AND TO EXTEND EXPERT DISCOVERY DATES filed by Sony Corporation. ***12/21/2012 Expert Deadline terminated. Expert Discovery cutoff 1/9/2013. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/5/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2012)
October 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on DDJR #1; 55 DDJR #2 ; 60 Motion to Strike ; 69 DDJR #4; 71 and DDJR #3. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2012)
September 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER TO TAKE DEPOSITIONS IN OSAKA, JAPAN. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on September 17, 2012. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2012)
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd Denying 45 Motion for Protective Order.(hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2012)
June 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER ON 43 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME. The motion for a protective order is deemed suitable for determination without oral argument. Accordingly, the July 31, 2012 heaing is VACATED. Defendant's request for hearing on July 3 is D ENIED. The following briefing schedule shall apply: Plaintiff shall file its opposition no later than July 3, 2012. Defendant shall file any reply no later than July 5, 2012. Any and all future discovery disputes must be resolved by complying with the undersigned's Standing Order re: Civil Discovery Disputes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 6/28/2012. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2012)
June 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER TO TAKE DEPOSITIONS IN OSAKA, JAPAN. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 6/18/2012. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2012)
April 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER SETTING DEADLINE TO FILE JOINT STATUS STATEMENT OR REFERRAL TO PRIVATE ADR. On or before June 4, 2012, the parties shall file a joint status report regarding their settlement efforts or file a request for referral to Private ADR. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/5/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tessera, Inc. v. Sony Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tessera, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin W. Hattenbach
Represented By: Morgan Chu
Represented By: Brian David Ledahl
Represented By: Nathan Nobu Lowenstein
Represented By: Melissa R McCormick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Corporation
Represented By: Eileen Regina Ridley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?