ELPIDA Memory, Inc. v. Nanya Technology Corporation et al
Plaintiff: ELPIDA Memory, Inc.
Defendant: Nanya Technology Corporation Delaware, Nanya Technology Corporation U.S.A. and Nanya Technology Corporation
Case Number: 5:2011cv04411
Filed: September 6, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION TO STAY PURSUANT TO 28 USC 1659 AND VACATING AND RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 35 Motion to Stay. This case is STAYED pending completion of the U.S. International Trade Commission's investigation. The Case Management Conference currently set for 2/7/2012 is VACATED and RE-SET for 8/13/2012 at 2:00pm. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2012)
January 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER re 30 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Conference set for 2/8/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 1/11/12. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2012)
January 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 22 Motion to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Conference set for 1/4/12 continued to 1/25/12.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2012)
December 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 13 Motion for Admission of Nathan W. McCutcheon Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ELPIDA Memory, Inc. v. Nanya Technology Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nanya Technology Corporation Delaware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nanya Technology Corporation U.S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nanya Technology Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELPIDA Memory, Inc.
Represented By: Robert William Busby, Jr.
Represented By: Andrew J. Gray, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?