Ferretti v. Pfizer, Inc.
Plaintiff: Delina Ferretti
Defendant: Pfizer, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2011cv04486
Filed: September 9, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 79 Stipulation.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2013)
February 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER REGARDING FILING OF STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on February 11, 2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2013)
January 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh denying 67 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2013)
January 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER VACATING MOTION HEARING AND CONFIRMING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AS SET. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on January 9, 2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2013)
January 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER RE: FILING OF CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on January 7, 2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2013)
November 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY re 60 Letter filed by Delina Ferretti. Counsel to arrange through CourtCall. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/27/12. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2012)
October 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND THE TIME FOR EXPERT DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on October 11, 2012. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2012)
August 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 32 Motion to Dismiss. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2012) CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 50
August 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER VACATING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on August 7, 2012. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2012)
April 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 4/16/2012. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2012)
February 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 14 Motion to Dismiss; denying 14 Motion to Strike.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2012)
November 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER CONTINUING BRIEFING SCHEDULE RE: 14 First MOTION to Dismiss PURSUSANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(B)(6); First MOTION to Strike PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(F), filed by Pfizer, Inc. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/22/2011. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ferretti v. Pfizer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delina Ferretti
Represented By: J. Gary Gwilliam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?