September 15, 2015 |
Filing
149
ORDER granting 134 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting 140 Motion for Settlement. The Clerk shall close this file upon entry of Judgment. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/15/2015. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2015) Modified on 9/15/2015 (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF).
|
July 16, 2014 |
Filing
116
ORDER GRANTING 114 Stipulation Regarding Class Certification filed by Richard Noll, eBay Inc., Rhythm Motor Sports, LLC. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/16/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2014)
|
August 27, 2013 |
Filing
106
ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Having reviewed the parties' Joint Status Statement, the court finds that a conference is unnecessary at this time and hereby VACATES the conference. The court shall set a Case management Conference , if necessary, after reviewing the parties' anticipated joint status report, which must be filed within one week of the completion of mediation. ***8/30/2013 CMC Deadlines terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/26/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2013)
|
July 16, 2013 |
Filing
104
STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT re 103 Stipulation Regarding Deferral of Defendants Response to Plaintiffs Consolidated Third Amended Class Action Complaint and Discovery filed by eBay, Inc. the Parties agree that eBays deadli ne to respond to the TAC and formal discovery will be deferred pending the Parties exchange of information and discussions concerning a potential resolution to the above captioned action. The Parties agree to submit a further submission to the Court proposing deadlines for eBay's response to the TAC, formal discovery, and other case management dates if necessary in light of the Parties' discussions. Status Report due by 8/23/2013. Status Conference set for 8/30/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/16/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2013)
|
May 30, 2013 |
Filing
101
ORDER Granting 91 Motion to Dismiss. Any amended complaint must be filed within thirty days from the date of this Order. Plaintiffs are advised that they may not add new claims or parties without first obtaining Defendants' consent or leav e of court to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15. Plaintiff is further advised that failure to amend the complaint in a manner consistent with this order may result in the dismissal of this action. signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/30/13. (ejdlc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2013) Modified text on 5/30/2013 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
|
September 28, 2012 |
Filing
89
ORDER GRANTING 87 Stipulation Setting Briefing Schedule for eBay Inc.'s Response to Consolidated Complaint filed by eBay, Inc. eBay's response due 10/17/2012. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/28/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2012)
|
September 24, 2012 |
Filing
86
ORDER GRANTING 85 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING DISMISSAL OF RELATED CASE filed by Richard Noll, Rhythm Motor Sports, LLC, eBay, Inc. The Parties agree and request that the Court enter an order that the running of any ap plicable statute of limitations shall be considered tolled as of no later than July 10, 2012. This stipulation is without prejudice to the Parties' respective positions regarding whether the statutes of limitations governing Rhythm's claims were tolled prior to July 10, 2012, or whether the assertion of Rhythm's claims relates back to a date prior to July 10, 2012, and the Parties expressly reserve their rights regarding such issues. Any issues regarding the tolling of limitations or the relation back of Rhythm's claims prior to July 10, 2012, shall be subsequently presented to the Court by the Parties when such a determination becomes necessary and appropriate. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/24/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2012)
|
September 4, 2012 |
Filing
83
ORDER granting 69 Motion to Intervene; finding as moot 70 Motion to Dismiss by Judge Edward J. Davila. Rhythm Motor Sports LLC shall file its complaint in intervention as a separate docket entry on PACER/ECF no later than September 18, 2012. Plaintiffs shall file a consolidated complaint no later than October 2, 2012. (ejdlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2012)
|
April 23, 2012 |
Filing
57
ORDER by Judge Edward J. Davila granting in part and denying in part 40 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 24 Motion to Dismiss (ejdlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2012)
|
December 28, 2011 |
Filing
44
STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Request for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss re 43 Stipulation. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 40 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint: Opposition due by 1/6/2012. Reply due by 1/20/2012. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/28/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2011)
|
December 9, 2011 |
Filing
37
STIPULATION AND ORDER to Enlarge Page Limits for Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/9/2011. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2011)
|
December 2, 2011 |
Filing
35
STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time for eBay Europe S.A.R.L. and eBay International AG to Respond to Complaint and Scheduling Motion to Dismiss Hearing for March 2, 2012 re 34 Stipulation. Response due 12/16/2011 Motion due by 1/27/2012. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/2/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2011)
|
November 16, 2011 |
Filing
33
STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING Request to Extend Time for Response and Reply regarding eBay Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss re 32 Stipulation. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 24 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint or, in the Alternative, MOTION to Strike: Opposition due by 12/9/2011. Reply due by 1/16/2012. Hearing previously set for 3/2/2012 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/16/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2011)
|
September 30, 2011 |
Filing
16
ORDER re 7 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 54611010375.) filed by Richard Noll. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 9/30/2011. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2011)
|